Global Patent Index - EP 1094157 A2

EP 1094157 A2 2001-04-25 - Process for preparing excavated material

Title (en)

Process for preparing excavated material

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Aufbereiten von Aushubmaterial

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la préparation de débris de creusement

Publication

EP 1094157 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00122568 A

Priority

DE 19950435 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19950435C1] The road surfacing machine (1) has a scoop separator (2) to remove surface material for mixing with a bonding agent such as lime, to reduce the moisture of the earth, and also separate boulders and stones from the earth at the same time. The machine (1) has a pressure vessel (3) for the bonding agent, held under pressure by a compressed air line (5) from the machine, and a feed line (6) connects the pressure vessel (3) with the scoop separator (2). The feed line (6) is operated by a control (7) in the driving cab (8). The pressure vessel (3) has a capacity of at least 750 liters and is held at an internal pressure of 1-2 bar.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung zum Aufbereiten von Aushubmaterial, bestehend aus einer Baumaschine oder Bauvorrichtung mit einem Schaufelseparator. Es wird die Aufgabe gelöst, eine solche Vorrichtung zu schaffen, die auf Baustellen mit beengten Platzverhältnissen und auf Baustellen mit lediglich geringen Bodenmassen eine wirksame Durchmischung des Bodens mit Bindemitteln ermöglicht, wobei diese Aufbereitung unmittelbar im Bereich der Aushubstelle erfolgen soll. Dies wird erreicht, indem der Schaufelseparator (2) mit einem Druckbehälter (3) für das Bindemittel in Wirkverbindung steht, wobei der Druckbehälter (3) über eine erste Leitung (5) von einer, der Baumaschine oder Bauvorrichtung zugeordneten Druckluftanlage beaufschlagbar und über eine zweite, mittels einer Steueranlage (7) betätigbaren Leitung (6) mit dem Schaufelseparator (2) verbindbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 21/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19950435 C1 20010329; EP 1094157 A2 20010425; EP 1094157 A3 20020612

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021213

2003-04-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-03-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-06-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 01C 21/00 A, 7E 02F 5/22 B, 7E 02D 3/12 B, 7E 02F 7/06 B

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI