Global Patent Index - EP 1094160 A2

EP 1094160 A2 2001-04-25 - Fluidized soil material supply machine

Title (en)

Fluidized soil material supply machine

Title (de)

Maschine zum Zuführen von Verflüssigter Erde

Title (fr)

Machine de distribution de materiaux terreux fluidisés

Publication

EP 1094160 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00122650 A

Priority

JP 29961399 A

Abstract (en)

A fluidized soil material supply machine comprises a machine body (1) provided with a traveling member (2), a raw soil conveyer (7) mounted to the machine body for conveying the raw soil from a raw soil hopper (8), a solidifying material supply device (9) mounted to the machine body for supplying a solidifying material, a mixer (3) mounted to the machine body for mixing the raw soil and the solidifying material to thereby produce a mixed soil, a mixed soil conveyer (10) for conveying a mixed soil produced in the mixer, and a liquid supply unit for supplying a liquid to be mixed with the raw soil and the solidifying material. A mixing device (40) operatively connected to the mixed soil conveyer (10) and adapted to mix the mixed soil conveyed through the mixed soil conveyer and the liquid supplied through the liquid supply device. A controller (52) is further provided so as to be operatively connected to detectors for detecting the raw soil supply amount, the solidifying material supply amount and the liquid supply amount, the controller acting to set required full amounts of the respective materials and stop operations of the raw soil conveyer, the solidifying material supply device and the liquid supply device at a time when the respective supply amounts reach the set full amounts. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02F 5/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02F 7/00 (2006.01); B01F 15/02 (2006.01); B02C 19/00 (2006.01); E02D 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02D 3/126 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1094160 A2 20010425; EP 1094160 A3 20030102; EP 1094160 B1 20060222; DE 60026101 D1 20060427; DE 60026101 T2 20060803; JP 2001115486 A 20010424; KR 100647056 B1 20061117; KR 20010051116 A 20010625

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150501

2015-05-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60026101

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131018

2014-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131018

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131016

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121017

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060222

2008-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2008-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080501

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070309

2007-04-20 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2007-01-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061123

2006-10-15 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20061015

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60026101 P 20060427

2006-02-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2006-02-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-02-22 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060222

2003-09-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2003-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2003-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 02D 3/12 A

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001018

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI