Global Patent Index - EP 1094161 A2

EP 1094161 A2 2001-04-25 - A tap

Title (en)

A tap

Title (de)

Ein Wasserhahn

Title (fr)

Un robinet

Publication

EP 1094161 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00122682 A

Priority

IT MI992190 A

Abstract (en)

A tap (1), particularly for kitchens, bathrooms and the like, comprising a body (2), a mixer (3) for mixing hot water and cold water, a water outlet spout (4), a securing device (5) to secure the tap to a supporting surface (80), a control device (6) connected to the mixer (3) to allow mixing of hot water and cold water and a manual control lever (7), connected to the control device (6), able to be operated manually by a user, the outlet spout (4) being screwed onto the mixer (3) and the body (2) consisting of a single tubolar member enclosing the mixer (3) and having a radial hole (22) for insertion of the spout (4) which must be screwed onto the mixer (3). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03C 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1094161 A2 20010425; EP 1094161 A3 20020508; IT 1316413 B1 20030410; IT MI992190 A1 20010419; IT MI992190 D0 19991019

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021109

2003-03-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-01-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI