Global Patent Index - EP 1094166 A2

EP 1094166 A2 2001-04-25 - Improved brick for construction

Title (en)

Improved brick for construction

Title (de)

Verbesserter Baustein

Title (fr)

Brique de construction améliorée

Publication

EP 1094166 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00500213 A

Priority

ES 9902653 U

Abstract (en)

IMPROVED BRICK FOR CONSTRUCTION, of the type used in construction work for the building of different kinds of walls and partition walls, presenting a series of hollows, making it lighter, and a tongue and grooved outline allowing it to slot into other similar bricks. The brick is essentially distinguished by its preferably parallelopipedic form and in the tongue and grooved outlines presenting one or more lengthways channels in the form of a round arch, which correspond with similar grooves in the adjacent element, forming a series of vertical and horizontal channels between both bricks, suitable for the installation of electrical wiring, water, gas, central heating or other pipes, without the need to cut into or make recesses or other holes in the wall. The said channels being sufficiently wide to allow for the said installations, which are bordered by areas not affected by the channel, allowing adjacent bricks to be firmly joined together by means of a cement or plaster grout, glue or any other joining material. The channel existing around the brick may be single or multiple and parallel, suitable for the constitution of parallel and independent installations.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/18; E04C 1/39

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/18 (2006.01); E04C 1/39 (2006.01); E04B 2/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 1/397 (2013.01); E04B 2/18 (2013.01); E04B 2002/0206 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1094166 A2 20010425; EP 1094166 A3 20021009; ES 1044457 U 20000501; ES 1044457 Y 20000901

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040812

2004-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040401

2003-07-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030325

2002-10-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI