Global Patent Index - EP 1094167 A2

EP 1094167 A2 2001-04-25 - Partition wall structure with quick assembly of filler panels

Title (en)

Partition wall structure with quick assembly of filler panels

Title (de)

Scheidunswandstruktur mit Schnellmontage der Füllpanele

Title (fr)

Structure de cloison de séparation avec assemblage rapide des panneaux de remplissage

Publication

EP 1094167 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00121802 A

Priority

IT TV990113 A

Abstract (en)

Partition wall structure, particularly for dividing internal areas, of a type having clips that operate in conjunction with hooking sections for the quick assembly of filler panels, comprised of: uprights that co-operate with corresponding sections and other fixing means on the ceiling and on the floor, or also with a mono-block partition, to whose uprights filler panels are fixed side by side on the two opposite sides, such as: at least one filler panel or a frame used to support the panel, having a longitudinal seating along the vertical edge adjacent to the said uprights, that grips a corresponding hooking section held on the opposite side, by at least a clip that is, in turn, inserted into a corresponding seating along the side of the upright in question; and also in which, in correspondence with each clip, there is a perpendicular seal that seals the gap between the adjacent panel that is mounted in the same way to the same upright. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/74; E04B 2/82

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/74 (2006.01); E04B 2/78 (2006.01); E04B 2/82 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/7863 (2013.01); E04B 2/7455 (2013.01); E04B 2/824 (2013.01); E04B 2002/7462 (2013.01); E04B 2002/749 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1094167 A2 20010425; EP 1094167 A3 20031203; IT 1311868 B1 20020319; IT TV990113 A1 20010423

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040604

2004-08-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-12-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-10-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 04B 2/74 A

2003-10-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 04B 2/82 B

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI