Global Patent Index - EP 1094168 A2

EP 1094168 A2 2001-04-25 - Bracket for securing and aligning form panels for floor edges

Title (en)

Bracket for securing and aligning form panels for floor edges

Title (de)

Bügel zum Befestigen und Ausrichten von Deckenrand-Abschalplatten

Title (fr)

Etrier servant à fixer et aligner des plaques de coffrage pour bordures de dalles

Publication

EP 1094168 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00810969 A

Priority

  • CH 192399 A
  • CH 20422000 A

Abstract (en)

The yoke (11) has a first arm (13) for connecting with the shuttering plates (9) and a second arm (15) for fixing on the wall or roof shuttering. The two arms are connected together seamlessly through a curved section which together with the two adjoining arms are all produced by bending or bending and stamping from metal. The first arm can be provided with means for horizontally fixing and aligning the shuttering plates.

Abstract (de)

Die beiden Schenkel (13,15) des Bügels sind vorteilhafterweise durch einen S-förmigen Abschnitt miteinander verbunden. Am vertikalen Schenkel (13) des Ausrichtbügels (11), mit dem Abschalplatten (9) über der Krone einer Wand (1) ausgerichtet und gehalten werden, sind Nivelliermittel (23) befestigt, welche eine exakte Ausrichtung der Höhenlage und der Seitenlage der Abschalplatte (9) bezüglich der Deckenunterseite (Kote h1) sicherstellen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 5/32; E04G 11/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 5/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 5/32 (2013.01); E04B 2005/322 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1094168 A2 20010425; EP 1094168 A3 20010829; EP 1094168 B1 20070328; AT 358219 T 20070415; DE 50014193 D1 20070510

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20161024

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161025

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161025

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161017

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-03-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080102

2007-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50014193 P 20070510

2007-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: GACHNANG AG PATENTANWAELTE

2007-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI

2004-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040706

2002-06-27 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-05-29 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI

2002-05-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY LI

2002-03-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020112

2001-08-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY LI

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI