Global Patent Index - EP 1094172 A2

EP 1094172 A2 2001-04-25 - Roofing sheet with adhesive layer

Title (en)

Roofing sheet with adhesive layer

Title (de)

Dachbahn mit Klebeschicht

Title (fr)

Bande de toiture avec couche adhésive

Publication

EP 1094172 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00122503 A

Priority

DE 29918623 U

Abstract (en)

The roof lining material (13), as a protection against moisture in the roof zone, has a layer (23) at its upper or lower surface of a rapid-action dispersion adhesive which is free of softeners. The adhesive is based on a synthetic resin, to bond several linings (13) together and/or to secure the lining (13) in place. The adhesive layer (23) is partially at the edge zones and/or the center zone of the roof lining 13).

Abstract (de)

Eine Dachbahn (13) kann als Feuchtigkeitsschutz im Dachbereich verlegt und an Elementen (12 bis 16, 17 bis 19) des Dachs befestigt werden. Die Dachbahn (13) weist an ihrer Oberseite (21) und/oder an ihrer Unterseite (22) eine Schicht (23) aus einem vorzugsweise weichmacherfreien, schnell abbindenden Dispersionsklebstoff auf Kunstharzbasis zur Verbindung mehrerer Dachbahnen (13) und/oder zur ortsfesten Fixierung der Dachbahn (13) auf. Es wurde eine zusammenrollbare Dachbahn geschaffen, die an ihrer Oberfläche eine integrierte Klebeschicht aufweist, die keiner zusätzlichen Abdeckung bedarf. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 12/00; E04D 5/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 12/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 12/002 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 903448 C 19540208 - UHDE GMBH FRIEDRICH

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29918623 U1 20000127; EP 1094172 A2 20010425; EP 1094172 A3 20010808

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030505

2002-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-02 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20020208;LT PAYMENT 20020208;LV PAYMENT 20020208;MK PAYMENT 20020208;RO PAYMENT 20020208;SI PAYMENT 20020208

2001-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010713

2001-08-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI