Global Patent Index - EP 1094175 A1

EP 1094175 A1 2001-04-25 - Fastening device of diagonal bars on scaffolding ladders and scaffolding obtained

Title (en)

Fastening device of diagonal bars on scaffolding ladders and scaffolding obtained

Title (de)

Befestigungsvorrichtung für Diagonalstreben an Gerüstleitern und damit hergestelltes Gerüst

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fixation des barres diagonales sur les échelles d'échafaudage et échafaudage obtenu

Publication

EP 1094175 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00402736 A

Priority

FR 9912953 A

Abstract (en)

Fixing assembly for diagonal bars (3) on a scaffolding comprises a clamp (19) at each end of the bars, each clamp having a jaw (29) to receive the mounting rod at the contact point with an horizontal bar. An Independent claim is also included for the scaffolding.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un dispositif de fixation des barres diagonales (3) sur les échelles (5) d'échafaudage et l'échafaudage obtenu. Le dispositif pour la liaison des échelles (5) de l'échafaudage comprend un ensemble de pinces (19) articulées chacune à une extrémité des barres diagonales (3), chaque pince (19) comportant deux mâchoires (29) de prise du montant (9) disposées de part et d'autre de son axe d'articulation à la barre, ces mâchoires (29) étant distantes l'une de l'autre d'au moins la largeur ou le diamètre des tubes de montant (9) d'échelle et d'au plus, à faible jeu près, la largeur de l'échelon (11) sur le montant, de sorte que la pince (19) peut être engagée latéralement sur le montant (9), au niveau d'un échelon sélectionné (11) et être manoeuvrée en rotation jusqu'a ce que ses mâchoires (29) viennent en prise sur le montant (9), aux niveaux supérieur et inférieur relativement à l'échelon (11), tandis que cet échelon (11) est enserré audit faible jeu entre les mâchoires (29). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04G 7/22; E04G 1/08; E04G 1/16; E04G 7/16; E04G 7/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04G 1/08 (2006.01); E04G 5/16 (2006.01); E04G 7/16 (2006.01); E04G 7/22 (2006.01); E04G 7/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04G 7/307 (2013.01); E04G 5/16 (2013.01); E04G 7/305 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1094175 A1 20010425; EP 1094175 B1 20050330; AT 292226 T 20050415; DE 60019058 D1 20050504; DE 60019058 T2 20060119; DK 1094175 T3 20050725; ES 2235801 T3 20050716; FR 2799783 A1 20010420; FR 2799783 B1 20020104; PT 1094175 E 20050630

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-02-28 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20161003

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-02-28 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20161019

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161024

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161011

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20161019

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20161019

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20161019

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-12-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: TUBESCA-COMABI, FR

- Document: AT 292226 T

- Effective date: 20141016

2014-08-12 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: TUBESCA-COMABI

- Effective date: 20140806

2014-07-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ARNOLD AND SIEDSMA AG, CH

2014-07-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: TUBESCA-COMABI, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: COMABI, FR

2014-07-15 [REG CH PFUS] MERGER

- Owner name: COMABI, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SOCIETE ANONYME DITE TUBESCA, FR

2014-06-12 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 60019058

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: E04G0007220000

- IPC: E04G0005160000

- Effective date: 20140506

2014-06-12 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: TUBESCA-COMABI SOCIETE EN NOM COLLECTIF, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SOCIETE ANONYME DITE TUBESCA, NOISY-LE-SEC, FR

- Document: DE 60019058

- Effective date: 20140428

2014-06-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60019058

- Representative's name: SPLANEMANN BARONETZKY KNITTER PATENTANWAELTE R, DE

- Effective date: 20140428

2014-05-06 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 60019058

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: E04G0007220000

- IPC: E04G0005160000

2014-04-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60019058

- Representative's name: SPLANEMANN BARONETZKY KNITTER PATENTANWAELTE R, DE

2014-04-07 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: COMABI, FR

- Effective date: 20140321

2014-04-01 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20140402

2014-04-01 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20140402

2012-10-03 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120906 AND 20120912

2008-01-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050630

2006-10-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-03-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060102

2005-11-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-10-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-05 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051005

2005-07-25 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2005-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2235801 T3

2005-06-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20050418

2005-06-15 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20050401699

2005-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: FREI PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2005-05-04 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: FRENCH

2005-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60019058 P 20050504

2005-04-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050330

2005-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-03-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-03-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-03-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050330

2005-03-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050330

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010430

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI