Global Patent Index - EP 1094178 A2

EP 1094178 A2 2001-04-25 - Device for connecting a handle to a door or window wing and method for installing a handle using said device

Title (en)

Device for connecting a handle to a door or window wing and method for installing a handle using said device

Title (de)

Vorrichtung für das Montieren eines Griffes an einem Tür- oder Fensterflügel, und ein Verfahren zum Montieren eines Griffes durch Verwendung der Vorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le montage d'une poignée sur le vantail d'une porte ou d'une fenêtre, et méthode pour le montage d'une poignée utilisant ledit dispositif

Publication

EP 1094178 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00122645 A

Priority

IT BS990099 A

Abstract (en)

A device (1) for connecting a handle (27) to a door or window wing (4) comprises a support element (2) consisting of a fixed portion (3) and a movable portion (5) rotatably engaged with each other. The support element (2) can be rigidly fixed onto a door or window wing (4) by threaded fixing elements (14) and centering blocks (12). The handle (27) can be inserted into a through aperture (10, 15) of the support element (2) to engage a movable portion (5) of the support element (2) in such a manner as to rotate rigidly with the movable portion. The device (1) also comprises a snap-locking system which fixes the handle (27) to the support element (2) as a result of its insertion into this latter. A finishing element (24) can also be associated with the support element (2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 3/065 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1094178 A2 20010425; EP 1094178 A3 20020313; IT 1310070 B1 20020205; IT BS990099 A1 20010423; IT BS990099 D0 19991021

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020914

2003-01-16 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-12-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI