Global Patent Index - EP 1094180 A2

EP 1094180 A2 2001-04-25 - Latch arrangement

Title (en)

Latch arrangement

Title (de)

Schliessvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de verrouillage

Publication

EP 1094180 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00308936 A

Priority

GB 9925009 A

Abstract (en)

A latch arrangement (10) including a latch bolt (12) connected to release means (14) by a transmission path (16), normal actuation of the release means causing unlatching of the latch arrangement, the latch arrangement further including an actuator (28) operable to provide a break in the transmission path following the occurrence of a predetermined normal condition of an associated vehicle, the transmission path being re-established by operator indication of an unlatching requirement following the predetermined condition ceasing to exist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/06 (2006.01); E05B 65/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 79/12 (2013.01); E05B 77/26 (2013.01); E05B 77/28 (2013.01); E05B 81/16 (2013.01); E05B 81/00 (2013.01); E05B 85/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1094180 A2 20010425; EP 1094180 A3 20030507; GB 9925009 D0 19991222

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080403

2007-07-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MERITOR TECHNOLOGY, INC.

2004-09-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040716

2004-01-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-12-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031017

2003-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-05-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05B 65/20 A

2003-05-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05B 65/42 B

2002-09-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ARVINMERITOR LIGHT VEHICLE SYSTEMS (UK) LTD

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI