Global Patent Index - EP 1094181 A2

EP 1094181 A2 2001-04-25 - A vehicle door latching mechanism

Title (en)

A vehicle door latching mechanism

Title (de)

Schlossmechanismus für Fahrzeugtüre

Title (fr)

Dispositif de verrouillage pour porte de véhicule

Publication

EP 1094181 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00308964 A

Priority

GB 9925008 A

Abstract (en)

A vehicle door latching mechanism comprises a latch (2), an actuator (3 or 4) for initiating actuation of the latch, and a substantially rigid elongate member (3a or 4a) associated with the latch and the actuator for operating the latch in response to operation of the actuator. The elongate member (3a or 4a) is a generally tubular member. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 77/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1094181 A2 20010425; EP 1094181 A3 20030514; EP 1094181 B1 20051228; DE 60025126 D1 20060202; DE 60025126 T2 20060803; GB 9925008 D0 19991222

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-12-17 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071012

2008-10-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080630

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2008-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071012

2006-12-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061208

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-12-07 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061207

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-12-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-12-06 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061206

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-02-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60025126 P 20060202

2005-12-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-12-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-09-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040719

2004-02-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-12-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031017

2003-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05B 65/20 A

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05B 65/12 B

2002-09-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ARVINMERITOR LIGHT VEHICLE SYSTEMS (UK) LTD

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI