Global patent index - EP 1094182 A2

EP 1094182 A2 2001-04-25 - A vehicle door latching assembly

Title (en)

A vehicle door latching assembly

Title (de)

Schlossmechanismus für Fahrzeugtüre

Title (fr)

Dispositif de verrouillage pour porte de véhicule

Publication

EP 1094182 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00308965 A

Priority

GB 9924935 A

Abstract (en)

A vehicle (10) having a passenger door (12,14) secured to a body (20) of the vehicle by means of a striker (32,34) located on the passenger door, the striker being engageable with a latch (36,38) located on the vehicle body. The mechanical cable (40) operating the latch is able to extend from the latch to a handle via a door post on the vehicle body rather than the passenger door, the door post being an inherently stronger portion of the vehicle and therefore less susceptible to side impact damage. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 63/00 (2006.01); E05B 53/00 (2006.01); E05B 65/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 63/0052 (2013.01); E05B 79/20 (2013.01); E05B 83/36 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1094182 A2 20010425; EP 1094182 A3 20030521; GB 9924935 D0 19991222

INPADOC legal status

2004-09-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031122

2004-03-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2004-02-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2003-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ARVINMERITOR LIGHT VEHICLE SYSTEMS (UK) LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI