Global Patent Index - EP 1094184 B1

EP 1094184 B1 2001-12-12 - A hinge for motor-vehicle doors, in particular for a hatchback

Title (en)

A hinge for motor-vehicle doors, in particular for a hatchback

Title (de)

Scharnier für KFZ-Türe, insbesondere für eine Heckklappe

Title (fr)

Charnière pour portes de véhicules, en particulier pour un hayon arrière

Publication

EP 1094184 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 99830665 A

Priority

EP 99830665 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1094184A1] Hinge for vehicle doors, in particular for articulating a hatchback to the body of a vehicle, comprising: a first and a second hinge element (12, 14) articulated to each other about a hinge axis (34) and intended to be fixed, respectively, to the vehicle and to the door, a screw (50) for fixing the first hinge element (12) to the body, the screw extending in a direction substantially orthogonal to said hinge axis (34), and an adjustment element (42) having an internal thread (48) and an external thread (46) co-axial with each other and engaging, respectively, the fixing screw (50) and a threaded hole (40) of the first hinge element (12). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 5/06 (2006.01); E05D 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/0423 (2013.01); E05D 5/062 (2013.01); E05D 7/043 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/531 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/546 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1094184 A1 20010425; EP 1094184 B1 20011212; BR 0003226 A 20010612; DE 69900610 D1 20020124; DE 69900610 T2 20020613; ES 2171070 T3 20020816

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121023

2014-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140116

2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121031

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121022

2013-07-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130628

2013-06-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121022

2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20120831

2012-08-31 [REG DE R231] PATENT ABANDONED FOR DE

- Document: DE 69900610

2012-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20111115

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20111103

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101020

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101020

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-08-06 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2171070 T3

2002-05-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69900610 20020124

2002-01-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000727

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI