Global Patent Index - EP 1094188 A2

EP 1094188 A2 2001-04-25 - Door sill

Title (en)

Door sill

Title (de)

Türschwelle

Title (fr)

Seuil de porte

Publication

EP 1094188 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00122006 A

Priority

DE 19950473 A

Abstract (en)

Door sill (10) has a metal profile (11) to which a plastic insulating profile (12) is locked. The insulating profile has a vertical door stop (13) and is provided with a step (14). The step is provided with an anti-slip surface (15) on one stepping surface (14') of the insulating profile. Preferred Features: The anti-slip surface is made of an elastic plastic, synthetic rubber, natural rubber or natural anti-slip material.

Abstract (de)

Türschwelle (10), mit einem Metallprofil (11), an dem ein aus Kunststoff bestehendes Dämmprofil (12) verrastet ist, das türinnenseitig einen vertikalen Türanschlag (13) aufweist und mit einem Auftritt (14) versehen ist. Um die Türschwelle so zu verbessern, daß die Rutschgefahr im Bereich des Auftritts verringert wird, wird sie so ausgebildet, daß der Auftritt auf einer Auftrittsfläche (14') des Dämmprofils oder eines Deckels des Dämmprofils mit einer rutschfesten Auflage (15) versehen ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 1/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 1/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 1/70 (2013.01); E06B 2001/707 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0851057 A2 19980701 - ALBANY INT CORP [US]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE LI LU NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1094188 A2 20010425; EP 1094188 A3 20021002; EP 1094188 B1 20050406; AT 292731 T 20050415

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20161019

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161012

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20161019

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-08-25 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ROTO GLUSKE-BKV GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HANS-DIETER NIEMANN, 50169 KERPEN, DE

- Document: DE 50009973

- Effective date: 20110705

2011-08-25 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ROTO GLUSKE-BKV GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: NIEMANN, HANS-DIETER, 50169 KERPEN, DE

- Document: DE 50009973

- Effective date: 20110705

2011-08-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50009973

- Representative's name: AXEL DRAUDT, DE

- Effective date: 20110705

2011-08-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50009973

- Representative's name: DRAUDT, AXEL, DIPL.-ING., DE

- Effective date: 20110705

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: NIEMANN, HANS DIETER

- Free text: NIEMANN, HANS DIETER#AM HUEGEL 17#50169 KERPEN-HORREM (DE) -TRANSFER TO- NIEMANN, HANS DIETER#AM HUEGEL 17#50169 KERPEN-HORREM (DE)

2006-03-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060110

2005-10-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-05-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50009973 P 20050512

2005-05-04 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-04-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2005-04-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE LI LU NL

2003-06-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE LI LU NL

2003-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030408

2003-02-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021214

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI