Global Patent Index - EP 1094192 A1

EP 1094192 A1 2001-04-25 - Patio door with integral glazing frame

Title (en)

Patio door with integral glazing frame

Title (de)

Verglaste Tür mit einheitlichem Verglasungsrahmen

Title (fr)

Porte vitrée avec cadre intégré pour le vitrage

Publication

EP 1094192 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99121163 A

Priority

  • EP 99121163 A
  • CA 2296157 A

Abstract (en)

Door frames for supporting large window lights or panes of glass within the frames can be constructed with thin, compression molded skins (30,31) by integrally forming at the peripheral edges of the aperture in the skins for the light or pane, integral edge strips (34,36) oriented normal to the skins surfaces with one of said edge strips having an upright flange (35) for holding a light or pane, which edge strips, when joined in an overlapping, interlocking relationship, form both a glazing frame for holding the light or pane in the frame and a closure for the edges of the two skins about the aperture in a water tight, solid joint and a removable glazing strip (47) attachable to the joined edges to retain a light or pane in the glazing frame formed in the resulting aperture with interlocking edge strips (34,36) of the skins (30,31), along with a perimeter frame (38) closing the outer edges of the skins (30,31) and a "foamed in place" core (66) in the hollow space between the perimeter frame and the joined edge strips. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/58; E06B 3/72

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/58 (2006.01); E06B 3/72 (2006.01); E06B 3/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/725 (2013.01); E06B 3/5892 (2013.01); E06B 2003/7023 (2013.01); E06B 2003/7082 (2013.01); E06B 2003/7086 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1094192 A1 20010425; EP 1094192 B1 20051228; CA 2296157 A1 20010717; CA 2296157 C 20070410; DE 69929199 D1 20060202; DE 69929199 T2 20060629; ES 2255216 T3 20060616

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161022

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151022

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131023

2015-04-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150408

2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131022

2014-08-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-08-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69929199

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-05-21 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140501

2013-03-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20121018

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20121024

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20121020

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121029

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-12-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-06-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2255216 T3

2006-02-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69929199 P 20060202

2005-12-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2005-12-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-06-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040419

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011016

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI