Global Patent Index - EP 1094198 A2

EP 1094198 A2 2001-04-25 - A method for drilling an underground tunnel

Title (en)

A method for drilling an underground tunnel

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Bohren eines unterirdischen Tunnels

Title (fr)

Procédé de forage d'un tunnel souterrain

Publication

EP 1094198 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00870241 A

Priority

BE 9900695 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a method and a device (1) for drilling an underground tunnel (35) with a tunnel wall (33), the device (1) comprising a drill head (2) for drilling ground and a driving (7) for driving the drill head (2). The device comprises a coating device (20) for forming a casing (32) for the tunnel wall (33), the coating device (20) comprising a formwork (34) with an outer face (36) facing the tunnel wall (33) and a device for supplying a coating material in a viscous state to an ejection nozzle (39) for ejecting the coating material in a space between the tunnel wall (33) and the outer face (36) of the formwork (34), the ejection nozzle (39) being rotatably mounted to allow the casing to be applied against at least part of the tunnel wall (33). The drilling device (1) further comprises an expandable gripping device (10) for pushing the drilling device off against the tunnel wall (33). <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21D 11/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21D 9/00 (2006.01); E21D 9/08 (2006.01); E21D 9/087 (2006.01); E21D 11/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21D 11/105 (2013.01); E21D 9/001 (2013.01); E21D 9/0873 (2016.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1094198 A2 20010425; EP 1094198 A3 20040211

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040812

2004-12-09 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-11-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI