Global Patent Index - EP 1094211 A1

EP 1094211 A1 2001-04-25 - A working machine throttle lever

Title (en)

A working machine throttle lever

Title (de)

Gashebel für eine Arbeitsmaschine

Title (fr)

Levier d' accélérateur pour machine agricole

Publication

EP 1094211 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99308364 A

Priority

  • EP 99308364 A
  • CA 2287467 A
  • CN 99123633 A
  • JP 11942298 A

Abstract (en)

A detachable working machine throttle lever is provided with a main body (25, 35), a rotative lever member (29) to which a wire (21) from an engine (3) is connected, and an engine stop switch (23). When the lever member (29) is rotated in one direction, an engine revolution speed is accelerated, and is decelerated when rotated in another direction. When the lever member (29) is rotated by more than a predetermined amount in any of the directions, the engine stop switch (23) is actuated and the engine (3) is stopped. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02B 63/02; F02D 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01D 34/68 (2006.01); F02B 63/02 (2006.01); F02D 11/02 (2006.01); F02D 11/04 (2006.01); F02D 17/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 11/04 (2013.01); F02B 63/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 5842277 A 19981201 - HAEBERLEIN JUERGEN [DE], et al
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 12 29 October 1999 (1999-10-29)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 05 30 May 1997 (1997-05-30)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 04 31 March 1998 (1998-03-31)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 257 (M - 1130) 28 June 1991 (1991-06-28)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 082 (M - 1215) 27 February 1992 (1992-02-27)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1094211 A1 20010425; CA 2287467 A1 20010422; CN 1295185 A 20010516; JP H11315731 A 19991116

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011026

2002-02-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI