Global Patent Index - EP 1094216 A2

EP 1094216 A2 2001-04-25 - A system for reducing fuel consumption in combustion engines

Title (en)

A system for reducing fuel consumption in combustion engines

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Reduzierung des Kraftstoffverbrauches in Brennkraftmaschinen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour diminuer la consommation en carburant des moteurs à combustion

Publication

EP 1094216 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00500215 A

Priority

PA 8484701 A

Abstract (en)

A system for reducing fuel consumption in combustion engines is described, which may be installed between the flange and the fuel filter, by means of which a reduction in the excess of pressure in the primary filter is achieved, which entails a consequent reduction of the amount of fuel going to the injection fuel pump. The system consists of three perforated plates for the passage of fuel, a pair of pistons provided for supplying pressure to the inside of the reducer system, a safety valve for moving the piston, and a spring for each piston, which keeps each one under tension and in its position. The system is applicable with diesel or "bunker" fuel. The fuel reduction achieved is within the range of 10 to 60% in comparison with current consumption. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 37/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/0017 (2013.01); F02M 37/0023 (2013.01); F02M 37/0047 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1094216 A2 20010425; EP 1094216 A3 20020502

INPADOC legal status


2006-08-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060503

2006-03-15 [32PN] PUBLIC NOTIFICATION UNDER RULE 80 EPC

- Ref Legal Event Code: 32PN

- Free Format Text: NOTING OF LOSS OF RIGHTS DATED 18.07.2005. LAST ADDRESS: C/SOROLLA 23, 11010 CADIZ, ESPAGNE

2003-01-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20021028

2002-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI