Global Patent Index - EP 1094226 A1

EP 1094226 A1 2001-04-25 - Conveyor operated by transfering of oscillating rotor inertias

Title (en)

Conveyor operated by transfering of oscillating rotor inertias

Title (de)

Förderer betrieben unter Verwendung von periodisch übertragenden Rotorträgheitskräften

Title (fr)

Conveyeur fonctioné par transmission des oscillations d' inertie d'un rotor

Publication

EP 1094226 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00203422 A

Priority

IT BZ990046 A

Abstract (en)

The conveyor has a mechanism, to apply a periodic swivel movement with identical frequency and phases different by 90 degrees , to two identical rotors. The mechanism consists of a crank arm/crank system, and of a bearing, which turns with eccentric axis between two guides fastened to the rotors. The first rotor has a two-phase switching device, with input connected to the material feed device, and outlet connected to the intake of an identical switching unit on the second rotor, the outlet of which is connected to the user. This produces a resultant from inertia forces of continuous character and constant direction, which is the feed volume of the materials to be mixed.

Abstract (de)

Beschrieben wird ein zweiphasiger Förderer einer Mischung von feinen Festbestandteilen mit pastösen und flüssigen Bestandteilen, beruhend auf der Verwendung von periodischen Rotorträgheitskräften. Gemäß der Erfindung umfasst der Förderer einen Mechanismus, der dem Paar von identischen Rotoren R1 und R2 eine periodische Schwenkbewegung identischer Frequenz und einer jeweils von 90° verschiedenen Phase auferlegt; der Schwenkmechanismus kann unterschiedslos aus einem System Kurbelstange-Kurbel oder auch aus einem Lager bestehen, das sich mit exzentrischer Achse zwischen zwei am Rotor befestigten Führungen dreht; an R1 ist eine zweiphasige Schaltung befestigt, deren Eingang E01 mit der Zuführrichtung der zu fördernden Materialien verbunden und der Austritt U01 mit dem Eintritt E02 einer identischen zweiphasigen, am R2 befestigten Schaltung verbunden ist, deren Austritt U02 mit dem Benutzer verbunden ist; dies alles, um eine Resultierende von Trägheitskräften kontinuierlichen Charakters und mit konstanter Richtung von E01 zu U02 zu entwickeln, welche die Fördermenge der Mischung bildenden Materialien beträgt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 33/00; F04F 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 15/02 (2006.01); F04B 19/20 (2006.01); F04D 33/00 (2006.01); F04F 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 19/20 (2013.01); F04B 15/02 (2013.01); F04D 33/00 (2013.01); F04F 7/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0964162 A1 19991215 - FRANCH GINO [IT]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1094226 A1 20010425; IT 1311122 B1 20020228; IT BZ990046 A1 20010404; IT BZ990046 D0 19991004; US 6511305 B1 20030128

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031028

2003-03-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030204

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011019

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI