Global Patent Index - EP 1094276 A1

EP 1094276 A1 2001-04-25 - Control device for opening the safety valve of the gas flow of a burner

Title (en)

Control device for opening the safety valve of the gas flow of a burner

Title (de)

Steuervorrichtung zur Öffnung eines Sicherheitsventils des Gasdurchflusses eines Brenners

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande de l'ouverture d'un robinet de contrôle du débit de gaz d'un bruleur

Publication

EP 1094276 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00402919 A

Priority

FR 9913216 A

Abstract (en)

Each gas tap is controlled by a safety electro-valve (4), of a size which can be located in a pipe (5). The valve includes an electromagnet (41) and a sealing washer (42), which closes the gas output passage, through the action of a spring which maintains the washer in closed position to block gas flow from the gas output (21). An electronic controller (6) supplies current to the windings of the electro-valves so that the washer is attracted towards the valve, against spring counteraction to allow opening of the gas output passage (21). The electronic controller (6) includes a part (61) which controls the electrical power dissipated in the winding of each electro-valve as a function of time from the start of opening of the gas passage. An Independent claim is also included for the hotplate burners.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un dispositif de commande de l'ouverture d'un robinet (RBT) du contrôle du débit de gaz d'un brûleur. Selon l'invention, le dispositif comporte pour chaque robinet, une électrovanne (4) comprenant notamment un électro-aimant (41) avec un bobinage (43) au nombre de spires donné, une pastille d'étanchéité (42) de taille suffisante pour permettre la fermeture du passage de sortie (21) du conduit de sortie (2) du robinet, ladite pastille étant entraînée axialement par l'électroaimant. L'encombrement de ladite électrovanne est tel qu'elle peut se loger dans un logement d'accueil (5) existant dudit robinet. En outre le dispositif comprend des moyens électroniques (6) de commande de la ou desdites électrovannes permettant de fournir dans le bobinage de chaque électrovanne un courant de pointe donné. Selon l'invention, le nombre de spires et le courant de pointe sont tels que le produit des deux est suffisant pour que la force électromotrice appliquée par l'électroaimant puisse entraîner le déplacement de ladite pastille (42) et l'ouverture du passage de sortie (21). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 3/12; F23D 14/72; F23N 5/10; F23N 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23N 1/00 (2006.01); F23N 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23N 1/005 (2013.01); F23N 5/102 (2013.01); F23N 2035/14 (2013.01); F23N 2035/16 (2013.01); F23N 2037/02 (2013.01); F23N 2041/08 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1094276 A1 20010425; EP 1094276 B1 20040128; DE 60007933 D1 20040304; DE 60007933 T2 20041223; ES 2215012 T3 20041001; FR 2800154 A1 20010427; FR 2800154 B1 20020322

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161020

2017-10-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170503

2017-05-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60007933

2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161028

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161014

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-14 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-27 [REG FR GC] LIEN (PLEDGE) CONSTITUTED

- Effective date: 20160426

2016-05-20 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: GROUPE BRANDT, FR

- Effective date: 20160420

2016-03-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GROUPE BRANDT, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FAGORBRANDT SAS, RUEIL-MALMAISON, FR

- Document: DE 60007933

2016-03-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60007933

- Representative's name: PRINZ & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAE, DE

2016-03-03 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: GROUPE BRANDT

- Effective date: 20160226

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151014

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151014

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-09-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-05-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FAGORBRANDT SAS, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BRANDT INDUSTRIES, RUEIL MALMAISON, FR

- Document: DE 60007933

- Effective date: 20120322

2012-05-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GROUPE BRANDT, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BRANDT INDUSTRIES, RUEIL MALMAISON, FR

- Document: DE 60007933

- Effective date: 20120322

2012-05-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60007933

- Representative's name: PRINZ & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAE, DE

- Effective date: 20120322

2011-11-03 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: FAGORBRANDT SAS

- Effective date: 20111021

2011-09-30 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: FAGORBRANDT SAS, FR

- Effective date: 20110826

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101020

2011-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101020

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091124

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-02 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2006-02-24 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-01-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2215012 T3

2004-06-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040520

2004-06-09 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BRANDT INDUSTRIES

2004-03-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60007933 P 20040304

2004-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-01-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021203

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010716

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI