Global Patent Index - EP 1094279 A2

EP 1094279 A2 2001-04-25 - Management of heated water in a storage boiler with anti-Legionella provisions

Title (en)

Management of heated water in a storage boiler with anti-Legionella provisions

Title (de)

Verwaltung von beheiztem Wasser in einem Speicher mit anti-legionella Vorkehrungen

Title (fr)

Traitement d'eau chauffée dans un accumulateur avec provisions anti-legionella

Publication

EP 1094279 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00203601 A

Priority

NL 1013341 A

Abstract (en)

A storage boiler having a hot water reservoir (1, 101), a tap water supply (6, 106), communicating with the reservoir (1, 101), for supplying tap water, and a tap water discharge (7, 107), communicating with the reservoir (1, 101), for delivering heated tap water from the reservoir (1, 101), further comprising water displacement provisions (10-15, 106, 107, 110, 111, 115, 116, 120-123, 130) (9, 109) for displacing water present in the reservoir (1, 101) within the reservoir (1, 101). By displacing water from one place to another place in the reservoir, Legionella growth in water that is relatively cool for a long time in the reservoir is controlled. Also described is a method utilizing this principle. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24D 17/00; F24D 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24D 3/08 (2006.01); F24D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24D 17/0073 (2013.01); F24D 3/082 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1094279 A2 20010425; EP 1094279 A3 20030115; NL 1013341 C1 20010423

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030501

2003-11-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-10-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI