Global patent index - EP 1094280 A2

EP 1094280 A2 2001-04-25 - Transportable device and method for lowering the concentration of pollutants in the air

Title (en)

Transportable device and method for lowering the concentration of pollutants in the air

Title (de)

Mobile Anordnung und Verfahren zur Verminderung der Konzentration von Luftschadstoffen

Title (fr)

Dispositif transportable et méthode pour réduire la concentration des polluants atmosphériques

Publication

EP 1094280 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00114783 A

Priority

DE 19950032 A

Abstract (en)

The arrangement has at least one air outlet opening (7) at the edge of an essentially flat working field (3) and at least one air input source (11) on the opposing edge of the working field and directed essentially towards the air outlet opening. The input air flow amounts to less than 50 per cent and preferably less than 20 per cent of the outlet air flow.

Abstract (de)

Entlang einem im wesentlichen flächig ausgedehnten Arbeitsfeld soll die Schadstoffkonzentration in der Atemluft vermindert werden. Die dazu vorgesehene mobile Anordnung umfaßt mindestens eine am Rand (1A) des Arbeitsfeldes (3) angeordnete Abluftöffnung (7). An dem etwa gegenüberliegenden Rand (1B) des Arbeitsfeldes ist mindestens eine einen Zuluftstrom erzeugende Zuluftquelle (11) angeordnet. Diese erzeugt einen entlang dem Arbeitsfeld im wesentlichen zur Abluftöffnung (7) gerichteten Zuluftstrom. Die Erfindung betrifft auch ein Verfahren zur Verminderung der Konzentration von Luftschadstoffen an der Atemposition eines Arbeiters, die sich von der zu bearbeitenden Stelle entfernt befindet. Zwischen der zu bearbeitenden Stelle (50) und der Atemposition (15) wird ein Luftschleier (53) zwischen einer Zuluftöffnung (54) und einer Abluftöffnung (55) erzeugt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 9/00; F24F 3/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 3/16 (2006.01); F24F 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 9/00 (2013.01); F24F 3/1607 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1094280 A2 20010425; EP 1094280 A3 20020717; DE 19950032 A1 20010426

INPADOC legal status

2003-12-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030118

2003-05-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-04-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI