Global Patent Index - EP 1094292 A1

EP 1094292 A1 2001-04-25 - Method for guiding a missile towards a target in case of target loss

Title (en)

Method for guiding a missile towards a target in case of target loss

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Führen eines Flugkörpers auf ein Ziel bei Zielverlust

Title (fr)

Procédé de guidage d'un missile vers une cible en cas de perte de cible

Publication

EP 1094292 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00121820 A

Priority

DE 19950667 A

Abstract (en)

The target guidance method has the target loss position and the target line of sight stored upon loss of the target to the passive radar missile guidance head, for guidance of the missile from the target loss position along the line of sight. A virtual image may be provided using the actual position of the missile relative to the target loss position, with guidance of the missile along the virtual sight line vector.

Abstract (de)

Wenn ein Flugkörper mit einem Suchkopf ein Ziel verliert, sei es durch Überschreiten eines zulässigen Maximalwertes des Schielwinkels, sei es durch Wegfall von Zielstrahlung etwa bei einem passiven Radar-Suchkopf nach Abschalten einer das Ziel bildenden Radarstellung, soll der Flugkörper trotzdem ins Ziel geführt werden. Das wird erreicht durch Speichern der Zielverlust-Position (14) und der Sichtlinie (mess <n> ,20) und Führen des Flugkörpers (12) auf die von der gespeicherten Zielverlust-Position (14) ausgehende, gespeicherte Sichtlinie (mess <n> ,20). Der Flugkörper wird auf diese Sichtlinie geführt durch Bestimmen der aktuellen Position (r<n>) des Flugkörpers (12) relativ zu der Zielverlust-Position, Festlegung eines virtuellen Zieles (18) auf der von der Zielverlust-Position (14) ausgehenden, gespeicherten Sichtlinie (mess <n> ,20) in einem vorgegebenen Abstand von der aktuellen Position des Flugkörpers (12), Berechnen eines virtuellen Sichtlinien-Vektors (virt <n> ) von dem Flugkörper (12) zu dem virtuellen Ziel (18) und Führen des Flugkörpers (12) nach Maßgabe des virtuellen Sichtlinien-Vektors (virt <n> ). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41G 7/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41G 7/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41G 7/2253 (2013.01); F41G 7/2213 (2013.01); F41G 7/2293 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1094292 A1 20010425; EP 1094292 B1 20040922; DE 19950667 A1 20010426

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151223

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-02-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151023

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151028

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-09-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050623

2005-08-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-02-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050116

2005-01-11 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-10-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50007863 P 20041028

2004-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2004-09-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-11-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031008

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT SE

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI