Global Patent Index - EP 1094371 A2

EP 1094371 A2 2001-04-25 - Induction heat fixing apparatus and image forming method

Title (en)

Induction heat fixing apparatus and image forming method

Title (de)

Fixiergerät mit Induktionswärme und Bilderzeugungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Appareil de fixage à chaleur produite par induction et méthode de formation d'images

Publication

EP 1094371 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00122869 A

Priority

  • JP 30034299 A
  • JP 30034399 A

Abstract (en)

An induction heat fixing apparatus is disclosed which has a rotating member, a pressure member coming in pressure contact with the rotating member to form a nip between the pressure member and the rotating member in such a way that a transfer medium on which a toner image has been formed is passable through the nip, and an electric-current applying means for applying an alternating current to the exciting coil to cause the rotating member to generate heat by induction heating by means of an eddy current generated in the rotating member. The pressure member is a pressure roller composed of a non-elastic material mandrel, a foamed material layer provided on the non-elastic material mandrel, and a release layer provided on the foamed material layer. Also disclosed is an image-forming method using the induction heat fixing apparatus as a fixing means in the step of fixing a toner image. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 15/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/2057 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1094371 A2 20010425; EP 1094371 A3 20020605; EP 1094371 B1 20050713; DE 60021242 D1 20050818; DE 60021242 T2 20060427; KR 100382532 B1 20030501; KR 20010060190 A 20010706

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141020

2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141031

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150501

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141020

2015-07-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150630

2015-06-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141020

2015-05-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60021242

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131007

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131028

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131018

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131031

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-06-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060418

2006-04-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-08-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60021242 P 20050818

2005-07-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-07-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-02-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031230

2003-02-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-12-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021017

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI