Global patent index - EP 1094429 A2

EP 1094429 A2 2001-04-25 - System for transmitting self-checking information of a vehicle to an accident service providing system

Title (en)

System for transmitting self-checking information of a vehicle to an accident service providing system

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Meldung von selbsprüfenden Informationen eines Fahrzeuges an einem System zum Bereitstellen von Diensten im Falle eines Unfalls

Title (fr)

Système de transmission d'informations autovérifiées d'un véhicule à un système de fourniture de service en cas d'accident

Publication

EP 1094429 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00122453 A

Priority

  • KR 19990045172 A
  • KR 19990058080 A
  • KR 20000037662 A

Abstract (en)

A self-checking information transmitting and accident processing service providing system which checks information about the defect and accident of a vehicle at a remote place, and promptly provides an accident processing service, thereby reducing the damage which is occurred by the accident. The system according to the present invention comprises a self-checking information transmitting system which detects and transmits the breakdown and the accident of the vehicle and an accident processing service providing system. The accident processing service providing system provides information about the location of the vehicle to an accident processing office. . Therefore, an accident can be prevented, and the life and fortune of the driver can be protected. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08G 1/127

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60R 16/02 (2006.01); B60R 21/00 (2006.01); B60R 21/01 (2006.01); B60R 21/0136 (2006.01); B60S 5/00 (2006.01); G06Q 50/00 (2012.01); G06Q 50/30 (2012.01); G08B 25/00 (2006.01); G08B 25/04 (2006.01); G08B 25/08 (2006.01); G08G 1/123 (2006.01); G08G 1/127 (2006.01); G08G 1/13 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/205 (2013.01); G08G 1/127 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1094429 A2 20010425; EP 1094429 A3 20020807; JP 2001184578 A 20010706

INPADOC legal status

2003-11-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030208

2003-06-05 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI