Global Patent Index - EP 1094433 A2

EP 1094433 A2 2001-04-25 - Posters

Title (en)

Posters

Title (de)

Plakate

Title (fr)

Affiches

Publication

EP 1094433 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00308352 A

Priority

GB 9924902 A

Abstract (en)

A poster comprises one or more sheets or strips of board. The board is formed from a first flat layer 11 printed on its exposed face and a second corrugated layer 12 bonded to the other face of the first layer. The poster may be a bill board poster formed from one or more strips of board, each extending the full width of the poster. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 7/18 (2006.01); G09F 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 7/18 (2013.01); G09F 15/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 2354870 A 20010404; GB 9924902 D0 19991022; EP 1094433 A2 20010425; EP 1094433 A3 20010613

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020114

2002-04-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-03-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-06-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI