Global Patent Index - EP 1094441 A1

EP 1094441 A1 2001-04-25 - Entertainment system

Title (en)

Entertainment system

Title (de)

Unterhaltungssystem

Title (fr)

Système pour divertissement

Publication

EP 1094441 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00309028 A

Priority

JP 29305999 A

Abstract (en)

A music editing unit (300) has an editing view displaying unit (a setting view displaying unit (304), a sound pattern setting view displaying unit (311)) for displaying an editing view on a display monitor (18), a track selecting unit (308) for selecting a track displayed on the display monitor (18) based on a control input from a manual controller (16), a sound pattern selecting unit (a sound pattern setting unit (310), a sound pattern editing unit (312)) for selecting a sound pattern corresponding to at least one of symbol images (400, 402, 404) in a pallet display area (420) based on a control input from the manual controller (16) to select the at least one of the symbol images, and a sound pattern registering unit (360) for registering the sound pattern selected by the sound pattern selecting unit (310, 312) in the track selected by the track selecting unit (308). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10H 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10H 1/0008 (2013.01); G10H 2210/026 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 5824933 A 19981020 - GABRIEL JOSHUA [US]
  • [A] US 5908997 A 19990601 - ARNOLD ROB C [US], et al
  • [A] US 5153829 A 19921006 - FURUYA YOJI [JP], et al
  • [A] AIKIN J: "EMAGIC NOTATOR LOGIC SEQUENCING SOFTWARE (MACINTOSH)", KEYBOARD,US,MILLER FREEMAN PUBLICATIONS, SAN FRANCISCO, vol. 19, no. 10, 1 October 1993 (1993-10-01), pages 120 - 121,123-128, XP000421118, ISSN: 0730-0158

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1094441 A1 20010425; EP 1094441 B1 20050420; DE 60019526 D1 20050525; DE 60019526 T2 20060223

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161012

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161004

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160919

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-09-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-04-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060123

2006-03-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60019526 P 20050525

2005-04-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-04-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-04-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050420

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011005

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI