Global patent index - EP 1094481 A2

EP 1094481 A2 2001-04-25 - Push button with resilient sealing element

Title (en)

Push button with resilient sealing element

Title (de)

Drucktaster mit federndem Dichtelement

Title (fr)

Bouton poussoir avec élément d'étanchéité élastique

Publication

EP 1094481 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00119931 A

Priority

DE 19950367 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19950367C1] A pushbutton key, especially for installing in a control or operating panel for machine operation, has a housing (1) in which is accommodated a spring-mounted press-button (2). The press- button (2) and the housing (1) are mutually sealed by a sealing element (3). The sealing element (3) is springily formed for resetting of the press-button (2) into an output position after actuation, and specifically has, during actuation of the press-button (2), displaceable or roll-up end sections (4), which are received into recesses (5) of the press-button.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Drucktaster mit einem Gehäuse (1), in dem ein Druckknopf (2) federnd aufgenommen ist, wobei Druckknopf (2) und Gehäuse (1) über ein Dichtelement (3) gegeneinander abgedichtet sind. Um einen konstruktiv vereinfachten Aufbau zu erreichen, ist das Dichtelement (3) zur Rückstellung des betätigten Druckknopfes (2) in seine Ausgangsposition nach Betätigung federnd ausgebildet. Damit entfällt ein separates Federelement zur Rückstellung des Druckknopfes (2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 13/14; H01H 13/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 13/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 13/063 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19950367 C1 20010201; EP 1094481 A2 20010425; EP 1094481 A3 20030129; EP 1094481 B1 20040804

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160914

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-09-14 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151120

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150924

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150910

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-07-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050506

2005-05-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2004-09-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-09-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50007274

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-09-09

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-09-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2004-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-08-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-10-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-06-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030425

2003-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030317

2003-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI