Global Patent Index - EP 1094535 A1

EP 1094535 A1 2001-04-25 - SOLID POLYMER ELECTROLYTE FUEL CELL

Title (en)

SOLID POLYMER ELECTROLYTE FUEL CELL

Title (de)

BRENNSTOFFZELLE MIT FESTEM POLYMERELEKTROLYTEN

Title (fr)

PILE A COMBUSTIBLE ELECTROLYTIQUE EN POLYMERE SOLIDE

Publication

EP 1094535 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99926831 A

Priority

  • JP 9903464 W
  • JP 18375798 A
  • JP 18376098 A
  • JP 26622198 A
  • JP 5820399 A

Abstract (en)

Disclosed is a polymer electrolyte fuel cell having an improved separator plate. The fuel cell comprises a solid polymer electrolyte membrane; an anode and a cathode sandwiching the solid polymer electrolyte membrane therebetween; an anode-side conductive separator plate having a gas flow path for supplying a fuel gas to the anode; and a cathode-side conductive separator plate having a gas flow path for supplying an oxidant gas to the cathode, wherein each of the anode-side and cathode-side conductive separator plates is composed of a metal and a conductive coat which has resistance to oxidation and covers a surface of the metal. Alternatively, the above-mentioned separator plates are formed of a metal and a coat having resistance to oxidation and have roughened surfaces with recessions and protrusions, and portions of a top surface of the protruding portions, which lack the coat, are electrically connected to an electrode. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01M 8/02; H01M 8/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01M 8/02 (2006.01); H01M 8/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01M 8/1004 (2013.01); H01M 8/0206 (2013.01); H01M 8/0213 (2013.01); H01M 8/0221 (2013.01); H01M 8/0228 (2013.01); H01M 8/0234 (2013.01); H01M 8/0254 (2013.01); H01M 8/0215 (2013.01); H01M 8/0223 (2013.01); H01M 8/04074 (2013.01); H01M 2300/0082 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1094535 A1 20010425; EP 1094535 A4 20011010; EP 1094535 B1 20061011; CN 1151573 C 20040526; CN 1307733 A 20010808; DE 69933566 D1 20061123; DE 69933566 T2 20070516; KR 100426094 B1 20040406; KR 100453597 B1 20041020; KR 20040011601 A 20040205; US 6660419 B1 20031209; WO 0001025 A1 20000106

INPADOC legal status


2013-05-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69933566

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120628

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120702

2013-03-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120628

2013-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120628

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110622

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110623

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110622

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110621

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-10-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070712

2007-04-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-11-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69933566 P 20061123

2006-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-10-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-10-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061011

2006-09-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.

2006-09-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NISHIDA, KAZUFUMI,ROOM 202, HAITSU-NISHIGUCHI

2006-09-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: YASUMOTO, EIICHI

2006-09-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GYOTEN, HISAAKI

2006-09-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HATOH, KAZUHITO,

2006-09-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: UCHIDA, MAKOTO

2006-09-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: OHARA, HIDEO,

2006-09-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SUGAWARA, YASUSHI

2006-09-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KANBARA, TERUHISA

2006-09-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MATSUMOTO, TOSHIHIRO

2006-09-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NIIKURA, JUNJI

2002-05-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020405

2001-12-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NISHIDA, KAZUFUMI, ROOM 202, HAITSU-NISHIGUCHI

2001-12-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: YASUMOTO, EIICHI

2001-12-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GYOTEN, HISAAKI

2001-12-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HATOH, KAZUHITO,

2001-12-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: UCHIDA, MAKOTO

2001-12-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: OHARA, HIDEO,

2001-12-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SUGAWARA, YASUSHI

2001-12-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KANBARA, TERUHISA

2001-10-10 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010824

2001-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001207

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT