Global Patent Index - EP 1094540 A1

EP 1094540 A1 2001-04-25 - Improved resonator filter and design method therefor

Title (en)

Improved resonator filter and design method therefor

Title (de)

Verbessertes Resonatorfilter und Entwurfsverfahren dafür

Title (fr)

Filtre résonateur amélioré et sa méthode de conception

Publication

EP 1094540 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99308220 A

Priority

EP 99308220 A

Abstract (en)

A dual mode dielectric resonator 10 comprises a plurality of dielectrics 12, 14, 16, 18, of known modes and quality factors, their intermode coupling also being known, and a conducting enclosure 20 of known Qd and Qc. The modes and quality factors are calculated by deriving a mode chart for the resonator including the eigenvalues. The filter does not require an iris. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01P 1/208; H01P 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/208 (2006.01); H01P 7/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01P 7/105 (2013.01); H01P 1/2084 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] D. KAJFEZ ET AL.: "TUBULAR DIELECTRIC WAVEGUIDES AND RESONATORS", 1988 IEEE SOUTHEASTCON-CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS, 11 April 1988 (1988-04-11) - 13 April 1988 (1988-04-13), KNOXVILLE (US), pages 566 - 570, XP002133233
  • [A] ZHONG-MIN ET AL: "TRIPLE-MODE DIELECTRIC RESONATOR LOADED CAVITY1", MTT-S INTERNATIONAL MICROWAVE SYMPOSIUM DIGEST,US,NEW YORK, IEEE, vol. -, 10 June 1991 (1991-06-10) - 14 June 1991 (1991-06-14), BOSTON (US), pages 687 - 690, XP000260445

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1094540 A1 20010425

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-05 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030905

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011012

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI