Global Patent Index - EP 1094551 A1

EP 1094551 A1 2001-04-25 - Terminal to connect electrically an electrical contact element with a conducting wire

Title (en)

Terminal to connect electrically an electrical contact element with a conducting wire

Title (de)

Klemme zum elektrischen Verbinden eines elektrischen Kontaktelementes mit einem Leiterdraht

Title (fr)

Borne de connexion pour connecter electriquement un contact électrique avec un fil conducteur

Publication

EP 1094551 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99120720 A

Priority

EP 99120720 A

Abstract (en)

The terminal has an insulating body (2) in which the contact element (4) is positioned in a chamber (3). An insertion opening (8) for the conducting wire is arranged in the insulating body before the contact element and the contact element is electrically connected to a contact part (5) extending out via an opening in a wall (2a) of the insulating body. The outwardly protruding section of the contact part has at least one circuit board pin (7).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Klemme (1) zum elektrischen Verbinden eines elektrischen Kontaktelementes (4) mit einem Leiterdraht (8), mit einem Isolierkörper (2), in dem das Kontaktelement (4) in einer Kammer (3) positioniert ist, wobei dem Kontaktelement (4) eine Einstecköffnung (8) im Isolierkörper (2) für den Leiterdraht (8) vorgeordnet ist, und wobei das Kontaktelement (4) mit einem Kontaktteil (5) elektrisch in Verbindung steht, das sich durch eine Öffnung in einer Wand (2a) des Isolierkörpers (2) nach außen erstreckt. Um bei Gewährleistung einer einfachen und kostengünstigen Herstellung einen sicheren elektrischen Kontakt zu ermöglichen, weist der nach außen abstehende Abschnitt des Kontaktteils (5) wenigstens einen Leiterplattenpin (7) auf. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/48; H01R 12/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/4836 (2013.01); H01R 12/515 (2013.01); H01R 12/718 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1094551 A1 20010425

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030926

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ELECTRO-TERMINAL GMBH & CO. KG

2003-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030312

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR IT

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010822

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI