Global Patent Index - EP 1094557 A2

EP 1094557 A2 2001-04-25 - PCB high current connecting device

Title (en)

PCB high current connecting device

Title (de)

Platinen-Hochstrom-Steckvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de connexion de courant fort pour un circuit imprimé

Publication

EP 1094557 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00122522 A

Priority

DE 19950084 A

Abstract (en)

The connector has a two-pole plug with plug and socket parts with contact elements in a multi-leg contact arrangement for contacting connecting points. The plug and socket parts have contact pins or sockets protruding into a protective collar or fitting. The socket has attachments to the board and a multi-leg contact arrangement with laterally protruding connection pins. Cable conductors can be pressed onto the plug part with a crimping tool. The connector has a two-pole plug with a plug part (6) and a socket part (10) with contact elements (12-15) for making an electrical connection and a multi-leg contact arrangement of the contact elements of the plug or socket part for contacting connecting points. The plug and socket part have contact pins or sockets protruding into a protective collar or fitting. The socket has attachments to the board and a multi-leg contact arrangement with laterally protruding connection pins. The conductors of a cable can be pressed onto the plug part with a crimping tool.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Platinen-Hochstrom-Steckvorrichtung (1) zur vibrationsfreien Kontaktierung von Platinenanschlußkontakten und zu übersteckender Hauptkontakte (12,13;14,15), wobei eine maschinelle Bestückung des Dosenteils (10) der Platinen-Hochstrom-Steckvorrichtung (1) auf Platinen möglich ist unter Ausrichtung in Platinenbohrungen. Anschließend erfolgt ein Verlöten der Anschlußstifte (41). Eine abgewinkelte Bauform in geringer Abmessung ermöglicht eine Anordnung am Rand zwischen Platinen-Einschubmodulen, ohne dass der Steckerteil (6) über den Anschlußraum an der Vorderseite der in Schränken aufgenommenen Einschubmodule der Platinen vorsteht und z.B. ein Verschließen der Schränke verhindert. Die insbesondere zum Anschluß der Spannungsversorgung mobiler oder stationärer Telefonanlagen dienende Platinen-Hochstrom-Steckvorrichtung (1) weist einen Stecker- und Dosenteil (6,19) mit Kontaktstiften (12,13) und hülsenförmigen -buchsen (14,15) auf, welche in einen Schutzkragen (24) oder Steckansatz (25) ragen und dort miteinander übersteckbar sind. Am Dosenteil (10) sind Befestigungen (19,20;19',20';38,39) zur Festlegung auf der Platine und an den Kontaktbuchsenrückseiten (16,16') jeweils eine Mehrbeinkontaktierung (18,18') mit seitlich senkrecht aus der Ebene des Dosenteils (10) vorstehenden Anschlußstiften (41) angelegt. Der Steckerteil (6) ist zum Dosenteil (10) derart abgewinkelt, dass die Crimpanschlüsse (77) aufweisende Kabelanschlußsteile (71) des Steckerteils (6) in einem Winkel von 90° gegenüber seinem Schutzkragen (24) und damit gegenüber dem mit diesem übersteckbaren Steckansatz (25) des Dosenteils (10) abgewinkelt ist, wobei die Kontaktelemente (12,13) zwischen Steckbereich und Kabelanschlußbereich etwa um 90° zueinander gewinkelt sind und die Kabelzuführung und die Anlage der Kontaktelemente (12,13;14,15) in einer zur Ebene der Platine (2) parallelen Ebene gegeben ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 12/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/20 (2006.01); H01R 12/50 (2011.01); H01R 12/71 (2011.01); H01R 13/512 (2006.01); H01R 13/53 (2006.01); H01R 13/58 (2006.01); H01R 13/64 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/716 (2013.01); H01R 4/20 (2013.01); H01R 12/58 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1094557 A2 20010425; EP 1094557 A3 20020626; EP 1094557 B1 20070530; AT 363748 T 20070615; DE 19950084 C1 20010816; DE 19964288 A1 20040108; DE 50014363 D1 20070712

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160829

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160919

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160831

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160907

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101031

2011-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: REMA LIPPRANDT G.M.B.H. & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20101031

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091015

2010-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-02-26 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090914

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071015

2009-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070530

2009-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20081031

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20081031

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-05-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080303

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070530

2008-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070530

2008-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070530

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070530

2008-01-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071030

2008-01-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2007-12-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2007-10-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2007-09-18 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-09-10 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070910

2007-09-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070813

2007-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2007-07-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50014363 P 20070712

2007-07-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2007-06-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2007-05-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-05-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070530

2003-03-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-06-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 12/32 A, 7H 01R 12/20 B

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001017

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI