Global Patent Index - EP 1094561 A2

EP 1094561 A2 2001-04-25 - Multipole electrical connecting system

Title (en)

Multipole electrical connecting system

Title (de)

Mehrpoliges elektrisches Steckverbindungssystem

Title (fr)

Système de connexion électrique multipoles

Publication

EP 1094561 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00121773 A

Priority

DE 19950129 A

Abstract (en)

The multipole electrical connector has a housing (32) into which are inserted a number of multi-contact bushes (1,3). The bushes are rectangular and are stacked. These are inserted from both sides, with contact pins connecting pairs. They latch into the housing. Each bush receives a contact sleeve (4) that has several crimped connector points.

Abstract (de)

Mehrpoliges elektrisches Steckverbindungssystem, bei welchem die Steckverbindung jeweils durch einen mehrpoligen Stecker (1) mit einem Steckerkörper mit mehreren nebeneinander und mindestens teilweise übereinander angeordneten Kontaktstiftelementen (2) und eine mehrpolige Buchse (3) mit einem Buchsenkörper mit mehreren nebeneinander und mindestens teilweise übereinander angeordneten Kontakthülsenelementen (4) gebildet wird, wobei zur Verbilligung der Herstellung und zur Erhöhung der Flexibilität des Systems untereinander gleiche, Kontaktstiftelemente (2) oder Kontakthülsenelemente (4) tragende Module (5, 8) vorgesehen sind, die je nach gewünschter Polanzahl der Steckverbindung zu einem Steckerkörper oder einem Buchsenkörper zusammenfügbar sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/518

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/518 (2006.01); H01R 13/514 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/518 (2013.01); H01R 13/514 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19950129 A1 20010419; EP 1094561 A2 20010425; EP 1094561 A3 20030507; EP 1094561 B1 20050309

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071005

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2007-07-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070629

2007-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070501

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-03-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051212

2006-02-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-10-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051010

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-10-05 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20050309

2005-09-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050929

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-06-20 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050620

2005-04-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50009711 P 20050414

2005-04-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2005-03-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-03-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-03-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050309

2004-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040205

2004-03-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030701

2004-02-04 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-01-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI