Global Patent Index - EP 1094686 A1

EP 1094686 A1 2001-04-25 - Mobile telephone loudspeaker

Title (en)

Mobile telephone loudspeaker

Title (de)

Lautsprecher für mobile Telefon

Title (fr)

Haut-parleur de téléphone mobile

Publication

EP 1094686 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00402728 A

Priority

FR 9912996 A

Abstract (en)

The transducer has a main winding (2) fixed to a diaphragm (3) as normal, but also has an additional winding (9) placed around the central pillar (4) of the permanent magnet (1). This auxiliary winding is connected in series such that movement due to currents induced by the on-off switching of the transmitter tends to be cancelled out. The ends of the transducer windings are preferably adhered to the back surface of the diaphragm. Both windings are of e.g. 40 - 50 turns and can be arranged in several ways, e.g. they may be fixed together or can be separated by a surface permitting them to slide relative to each other. The second winding may be stationary, e.g. adhered to the central pillar of the permanent magnet, or it can be placed outside the field of the magnet.

Abstract (fr)

Pour réduire les effets de champs électromagnétiques perturbateurs intenses sur un haut-parleur d'un téléphone mobile, on munit le haut-parleur d'une bobine de compensation en sus d'une bobine d'excitation. La bobine de compensation est montée en série avec la bobine d'excitation. Elle est toutefois dispensée d'un rôle moteur en la collant contre l'aimant permanent du haut-parleur. On montre qu'on réduit les effets néfastes sans empêcher le haut-parleur de fonctionner. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 9/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 9/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 9/063 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1094686 A1 20010425; EP 1094686 B1 20030514; DE 60002649 D1 20030618; DE 60002649 T2 20040401; ES 2193925 T3 20031116; FR 2799919 A1 20010420; FR 2799919 B1 20021011; US 2004208337 A1 20041021; US 6901150 B1 20050531

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2012-05-30 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120503 AND 20120509

2012-05-23 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120426 AND 20120502

2012-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101005

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101004

2011-11-21 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20111121

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101004

2011-08-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60002649

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101102

2011-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110630

2011-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101004

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091201

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091009

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-04-02 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091118

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-01-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20091006

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090928

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-03-16 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2007-03-16 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2007-03-16 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-05-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040217

2003-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2193925 T3

2003-06-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60002649 P 20030618

2003-06-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030515

2003-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-05-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-30 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE LI

2001-10-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAGEM S.A.

2001-09-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010816

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010316

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE LI

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI