Global Patent Index - EP 1094724 A1

EP 1094724 A1 2001-05-02 - USE OF A PHENOL OXIDISING ENZYME IN THE TREATMENT OF TOBACCO

Title (en)

USE OF A PHENOL OXIDISING ENZYME IN THE TREATMENT OF TOBACCO

Title (de)

VERWENDUNG EINES PHENOLOXIDIERENDEN ENZYMES ZUM BEHANDELN VON TABAK

Title (fr)

UTILISATION D'UNE ENZYME OXYDANT LES PHENOLS DANS LE TRAITEMENT DU TABAC

Publication

EP 1094724 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99931028 A

Priority

  • DK 9900389 W
  • DK PA199800905 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0002464A1] A process for preparing tobacco, which process comprises the steps of treating a tobacco material with a phenol oxidising enzyme, such as by extracting tobacco with a solvent to provide an extract and a residue; and treating the extract with a phenol oxidising enzyme such as a laccase. An improved tobacco product having a reduced amount of phenolic compounds. This is an alternative or a supplement to a process in which the phenolic compounds are adsorbed onto the insoluble carrier polyvinylpolypyrrolidone (PVPP). In preferred embodiments, the process includes further steps of removing the oxidised phenolic compound, adding adsorbents such as bentonite; removing and/or inactivating the enzyme; and concentrating the extract. Preferred phenol oxidising enzymes are peroxidases and laccases. The thus treated extract is advantageously re-combined with the tobacco residue and further processed to provide a tobacco article for smoking.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A24B 15/24; A24B 15/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A24B 15/20 (2006.01); A24B 15/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A24B 15/20 (2013.01); A24B 15/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0002464A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0002464 A1 20000120; AT 225612 T 20021015; AU 4769899 A 20000201; AU 761885 B2 20030612; BR 9911909 A 20010327; BR 9911909 B1 20090113; CA 2316249 A1 20000120; CA 2316249 C 20121127; DE 69903430 D1 20021114; DE 69903430 T2 20030605; EP 1094724 A1 20010502; EP 1094724 B1 20021009; JP 2002520005 A 20020709; JP 2011010656 A 20110120; JP 2014057603 A 20140403

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150731

2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150731

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160202

2016-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150731

2016-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150731

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150707

2016-04-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160331

2016-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150707

2016-02-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69903430

2015-01-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20140714

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140708

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140702

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140702

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140714

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-10-13 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20100916 AND 20100922

2010-08-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2010-08-13 [REG CH PK] CORRECTION

- Free text: DIE VERTRETERLOESCHUNG VON R.A. EGLI UND CO. UND DER NACHFOLGENDE VERTRETEREINTRAG VON KIRKER & CIE ERFOLGTEN IRRTUEMLICH.

2010-08-06 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2010-07-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE S.A.

2010-07-30 [REG CH PUEA] ASSIGNMENT OF THE SHARE

- Owner name: NOVOZYMES A/S

- Free text: IMPERIAL TOBACCO LIMITED#3810, RUE SAINT-ANTOINE STREET#MONTREAL, QUEBEC H4C 1B5 (CA) $ NOVOZYMES A/S#KROGSHOEJVEJ 36#2880 BAGSVAERD (DK) -TRANSFER TO- NOVOZYMES A/S#KROGSHOEJVEJ 36#2880 BAGSVAERD (DK) $ BRITISH AMERICAN TOBACCO (INVESTMENTS) LIMITED#GLOBE HOUSE, 1 WATER STREET#LONDON WC2R 3LA (GB)

2009-07-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: NOVOZYMES A/S

- Effective date: 20090709

2009-07-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: BRITISH AMERICAN TABACCO INVESTMENTS LTDKROGSHOEJV

- Effective date: 20090709

2009-07-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: GLOBE HOUSE, 1 WATER STREET, GB-LONDON WC2R 3LA (G

- Effective date: 20090709

2009-07-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: NOVOZYMES A/S

- Effective date: 20090709

2009-07-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: BRITISH AMERICAN TABACCO INVESTMENTS LTD

- Effective date: 20090709

2009-07-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: BRITISH AMERICAN TABACCO INVESTMENTS LTDKROGSHOEJV

- Effective date: 20090709

2009-07-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: GLOBE HOUSE, 1 WATER STREET, GB-LONDON WC2R 3LA (G

- Effective date: 20090709

2004-05-05 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2003-10-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030710

2003-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-07 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030707

2003-07-07 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030707

2003-07-07 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030707

2003-05-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030429

2003-04-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2003-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-03-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20021009

2003-01-09 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030109

2003-01-09 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030109

2003-01-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030109

2002-11-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69903430 20021114

2002-11-13 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-10-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-10-09 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021009

2002-10-09 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021009

2002-10-09 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021009

2002-10-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021009

2002-10-09 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021009

2002-10-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 225612 T 20021015

2001-08-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KIERULFF, JESPER, VALLENTIN

2001-08-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JOERGENSEN, OLE, BILL

2001-08-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HANSEN, TOMAS, TAGE

2001-08-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KNOX, ANTHONY, JAMES

2001-08-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DE GRANDPRE, YVES

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010606

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010208

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI