Global Patent Index - EP 1094730 A1

EP 1094730 A1 2001-05-02 - STRAP-ATTACHED SPUR

Title (en)

STRAP-ATTACHED SPUR

Title (de)

SPORENBÜGEL MIT RIEMENBEFESTIGUNG

Title (fr)

EPERON A FIXATION PAR COURROIES

Publication

EP 1094730 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99916749 A

Priority

  • DE 9900446 W
  • DE 29811754 U
  • DE 29811838 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0001268A1] The invention relates to a strap-attached spur which is configured substantially U-shaped and has two lateral bars (24). Two spur strap eyelets (30, 32) are provided for in each free end of each bar (24) and receive a spur strap (22) of the strap attachment. The two spur strap eyelets (30, 32) of either end are not parallel but form an acute angle between each other.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43C 17/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43C 17/00 (2006.01); A43C 17/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43C 17/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0001268A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0001268 A1 20000113; AT 229286 T 20021215; AU 3514999 A 20000124; AU 752260 B2 20020912; CA 2336319 A1 20000113; CA 2336319 C 20060221; DE 59903763 D1 20030123; DK 1094730 T3 20030317; EP 1094730 A1 20010502; EP 1094730 B1 20021211; ES 2188156 T3 20030616; PT 1094730 E 20030430; US 2001013216 A1 20010816; US 6381931 B2 20020507

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180221

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180221

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20180221

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180221

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-03-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180221

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-02-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170220

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170217

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170221

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170220

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160218

2016-02-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150818

2015-08-26 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20150818

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150225

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-06-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20140210

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070904

2008-07-04 [REG FR EERR] CORRECTION AND/OR MODIFICATIONS ON EUROPEAN PATENTS WHICH HAVE EFFECT OR NO EFFECT IN FRANCE

- Free text: CORRECTION DE BOPI 03/44 - BREVETS EUROPEENS DONT LA TRADUCTION N A PAS ETE REMISE A L INPI. IL Y A LIEU DE SUPPRIMER : LA MENTION DE LA NON REMISE. LA REMISE DE LA TRADUCTION EST A CONSIDERER COMME NULLE ET NON AVENUE.

2008-06-20 [REG FR EERR] CORRECTION AND/OR MODIFICATIONS ON EUROPEAN PATENTS WHICH HAVE EFFECT OR NO EFFECT IN FRANCE

- Free text: CORRECTION DE BOPI 03/44 - BREVETS EUROPEENS DONT LA TRADUCTION N A PAS ETE REMISE A L INPI. IL Y A LIEU DE SUPPRIMER : LA MENTION DE LA NON-REMISE. LA REMISE DE LA TRADUCTION EST A CONSIDERER COMME NULLE ET NON AVENUE.

2006-02-21 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20060221

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-12-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030912

2003-10-31 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-08-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-08-01 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-06-20 [REG FR FC] FAVOURABLE DECISION OF INPI DIRECTOR GENERAL ON AN APPLICATION FOR RESTAURATION.

2003-06-20 [REG FR RN] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION

2003-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2188156 T3

2003-04-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20030303

2003-04-24 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030400971

2003-04-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030310

2003-03-25 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-03-17 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-01-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903763 20030123

2002-12-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

2002-12-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-11 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021211

2002-12-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 229286 T 20021215

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020624

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010205

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE