Global Patent Index - EP 1094730 B1

EP 1094730 B1 2002-12-11 - STRAP-ATTACHED SPUR

Title (en)

STRAP-ATTACHED SPUR

Title (de)

SPORENBÜGEL MIT RIEMENBEFESTIGUNG

Title (fr)

EPERON A FIXATION PAR COURROIES

Publication

EP 1094730 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99916749 A

Priority

  • DE 9900446 W
  • DE 29811754 U
  • DE 29811838 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0001268A1] The invention relates to a strap-attached spur which is configured substantially U-shaped and has two lateral bars (24). Two spur strap eyelets (30, 32) are provided for in each free end of each bar (24) and receive a spur strap (22) of the strap attachment. The two spur strap eyelets (30, 32) of either end are not parallel but form an acute angle between each other.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43C 17/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43C 17/00 (2006.01); A43C 17/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43C 17/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0001268 A1 20000113; AT 229286 T 20021215; AU 3514999 A 20000124; AU 752260 B2 20020912; CA 2336319 A1 20000113; CA 2336319 C 20060221; DE 59903763 D1 20030123; DK 1094730 T3 20030317; EP 1094730 A1 20010502; EP 1094730 B1 20021211; ES 2188156 T3 20030616; PT 1094730 E 20030430; US 2001013216 A1 20010816; US 6381931 B2 20020507

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180226

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20180222

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20180221

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180221

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180221

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20180221

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180221

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-03-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180221

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-02-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170217

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160218

2016-02-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150818

2015-08-26 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20150818

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150225

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-06-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20140210

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070904

2008-07-04 [REG FR EERR] CORRECTION AND/OR MODIFICATIONS ON EUROPEAN PATENTS WHICH HAVE EFFECT OR NO EFFECT IN FRANCE

- Free text: CORRECTION DE BOPI 03/44 - BREVETS EUROPEENS DONT LA TRADUCTION N A PAS ETE REMISE A L INPI. IL Y A LIEU DE SUPPRIMER : LA MENTION DE LA NON REMISE. LA REMISE DE LA TRADUCTION EST A CONSIDERER COMME NULLE ET NON AVENUE.

2008-06-20 [REG FR EERR] CORRECTION AND/OR MODIFICATIONS ON EUROPEAN PATENTS WHICH HAVE EFFECT OR NO EFFECT IN FRANCE

- Free text: CORRECTION DE BOPI 03/44 - BREVETS EUROPEENS DONT LA TRADUCTION N A PAS ETE REMISE A L INPI. IL Y A LIEU DE SUPPRIMER : LA MENTION DE LA NON-REMISE. LA REMISE DE LA TRADUCTION EST A CONSIDERER COMME NULLE ET NON AVENUE.

2006-02-21 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20060221

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-12-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030912

2003-10-31 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-08-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-08-01 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-06-20 [REG FR FC] FAVOURABLE DECISION OF INPI DIRECTOR GENERAL ON AN APPLICATION FOR RESTAURATION.

2003-06-20 [REG FR RN] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION

2003-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2188156 T3

2003-04-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20030303

2003-04-24 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030400971

2003-04-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030310

2003-03-25 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-03-17 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2003-01-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903763 20030123

2002-12-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

2002-12-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-11 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021211

2002-12-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 229286 T 20021215

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020624

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010205

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE