Global Patent Index - EP 1094733 A1

EP 1094733 A1 2001-05-02 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING BRUSHWARE AND BRUSHWARE PRODUCING ACCORDING TO SAID METHOD

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING BRUSHWARE AND BRUSHWARE PRODUCING ACCORDING TO SAID METHOD

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BORSTENWAREN UND DANACH HERGESTELLTE BORSTENWAREN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'ARTICLES DE BROSSERIE ET ARTICLES DE BROSSERIE OBTENUS A L'AIDE DUDIT PROCEDE

Publication

EP 1094733 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99929312 A

Priority

  • DE 19829943 A
  • EP 9904372 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19829943A1] The invention relates to a method for producing brushware having plastic bristles, according to which the bristles (3) are produced by continuous extrusion as monofilaments, cut to the desired length and fixed to a bristle support individually or in groups to serve as bristle trim (2). According to the invention the monofilament formed by extrusion or the bristles (3) produced therefrom are provided with at least one substantially linear demarcation which can be identified at the level of the bristle trim of the finished brushware article as a colour marking (9) and is situated at a distance from the useable end of the bristles (3), said distance indicating the state of use. In a brushware article produced according to this method at least a part of the bristles situated outside the bristle trim (2) comprises a substantially linear demarcation in the form of a colour marking which is situated at a distance from the useable end of the bristles, said distance indicating the state of use of same.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A46D 1/00; A46B 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A46D 1/04 (2006.01); A46B 15/00 (2006.01); A46D 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A46B 15/001 (2013.01); A46B 15/0002 (2013.01); A46D 1/00 (2013.01); A46D 1/023 (2013.01); A46D 1/0276 (2013.01); A46D 1/0284 (2013.01); A46D 1/0292 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0001275A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19829943 A1 20000105; AR 019748 A1 20020313; AT 236549 T 20030415; AU 4615699 A 20000124; AU 749272 B2 20020620; BR 9911815 A 20010327; CA 2336615 A1 20000113; CN 1132539 C 20031231; CN 1303243 A 20010711; CZ 20010033 A3 20010912; DK 1094733 T3 20030804; EG 21990 A 20020531; EP 1094733 A1 20010502; EP 1094733 B1 20030409; ES 2193719 T3 20031101; HU 0201845 A2 20020928; HU 225369 B1 20061028; ID 27799 A 20010426; JP 2002519126 A 20020702; NO 20005202 A 20010104; NO 20005202 D0 20001016; PL 193267 B1 20070131; PL 345362 A1 20011217; PT 1094733 E 20030829; RU 2208374 C2 20030720; TR 200003459 T2 20010621; TW 400218 B 20000801; US 6412139 B1 20020702; WO 0001275 A1 20000113; ZA 200005373 B 20010511

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080625

2010-05-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2010-01-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090106

2009-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080625

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080624

2009-08-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080625

2009-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080624

2009-06-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090107

2009-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-05-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090101

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070605

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-04-30 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20090212

2009-04-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080624

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090101

2009-04-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080624

2009-04-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090228

2009-04-01 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2009-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-03-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090101

2009-02-27 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080624

2009-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080624

2009-02-17 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-02-02 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2009-01-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081229

2009-01-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-01-09 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20081229

2008-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *CORONET-WERKE G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20080630

2008-05-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20070626

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070625

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070627

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070613

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-06-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20070629

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-06-27 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20070627

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-06-25 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070625

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-06-25 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070625

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-06-21 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20070621

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-06-21 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20070621

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-06-20 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070620

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-06-18 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070618

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-06-18 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070618

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-06-14 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070614

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2004-03-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040112

2003-12-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2193719 T3

2003-08-04 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2003-07-16 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030402254

2003-07-01 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-06-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-05-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2003-05-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2003-04-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: RO SI

2003-04-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020207

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000927

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 20000927;SI PAYMENT 20000927