Global Patent Index - EP 1094742 A1

EP 1094742 A1 2001-05-02 - VACUUM CLEANER MOUTHPIECE

Title (en)

VACUUM CLEANER MOUTHPIECE

Title (de)

STAUBSAUGERMUNDSTÜCK

Title (fr)

EMBOUT D'ASPIRATEUR

Publication

EP 1094742 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99931152 A

Priority

  • DE 19828873 A
  • EP 9904356 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19828873A1] The mouthpiece has a lower part (1) that is at least partially adaptable for applying suction to different floor coverings with at least one suction channel that can be coupled to a suction connection via a connecting channel in the mouthpiece. Several suction channels (8-10) specially adapted to applying suction to different floor coverings arranged on the lower part of the mouthpiece can be selectively coupled to the suction connector.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9966823A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19828873 A1 19991230; DE 59914098 D1 20070208; EP 1094742 A1 20010502; EP 1094742 B1 20061227; KR 100429415 B1 20040429; TR 200003564 T2 20010621; WO 9966823 A1 19991229

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-04-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59914098

- Effective date: 20130101

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110630

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061227

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070817

2007-12-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070928

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061227

2007-08-17 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2007-07-25 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20061227

2007-03-27 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070327

2007-02-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59914098 P 20070208

2006-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2006-12-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-12-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061227

2004-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020621

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010125

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE