Global Patent Index - EP 1094767 A1

EP 1094767 A1 2001-05-02 - ROCKING LENS IMPLANTATION APPARATUS

Title (en)

ROCKING LENS IMPLANTATION APPARATUS

Title (de)

SCHWENKVORRICHTUNG ZUR IMPLANTATION VON LINSEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF BASCULANT POUR IMPLANTATION DE LENTILLE

Publication

EP 1094767 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98934278 A

Priority

US 9813967 W

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61F 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61F 2/16 (2006.01); A61F 9/00 (2006.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

AU 8384098 A 20000124; EP 1094767 A1 20010502; EP 1094767 A4 20010926

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-13 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030204

2002-04-24 [DX] MISCELLANEOUS: (DELETED)

2001-09-26 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010813

2001-09-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61F 9/00 A, 7A 61F 2/16 B

2001-07-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SUGRICAL CONCEPTS, INC.

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010205

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE