Global Patent Index - EP 1094781 A1

EP 1094781 A1 2001-05-02 - COMPOSITIONS FOR RAPID AND NON-IRRITATING TRANSDERMAL DELIVERY OF PHARMACEUTICALLY ACTIVE AGENTS AND METHODS FOR FORMULATING SUCH COMPOSITIONS AND DELIVERY THEREOF

Title (en)

COMPOSITIONS FOR RAPID AND NON-IRRITATING TRANSDERMAL DELIVERY OF PHARMACEUTICALLY ACTIVE AGENTS AND METHODS FOR FORMULATING SUCH COMPOSITIONS AND DELIVERY THEREOF

Title (de)

ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN FÜR DIE SCHNELLE UND NICHT-IRRITIERENDE TRANSDERMALE VERABREICHUNG VON PHARMAZEUTIKA AND VERFAHREN ZUR FORMULIERING DAVON UND IHREN VERABREICHUNG

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS D'ADMINISTRATION TRANSDERMIQUE RAPIDE ET NON IRRITANTE D'AGENTS PHARMACEUTIQUES ACTIFS ET METHODES POUR LA FORMULATION DE CES COMPOSITIONS ET LEUR ADMINISTRATION

Publication

EP 1094781 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99933731 A

Priority

  • US 9915297 W
  • US 9191098 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0001351A1] Pharmaceutical compositions for the transdermal administration of a medicament or other active agent by topical application of the composition to the skin of humans or other animals are described. Methodology for formulating such compositions which provide for very rapid uptake of the medicament and transmigration into and through the skin to either fatty tissues or the vascular system, while minimizing irritation to the skin and/or immunological response, is based on a transdermal delivery system (TDS) wherein the medicament is modified to form a true solution in a complex formed from particular solvents and solvent and solute modifiers in combination with skin stabilizers. Uptake of the medicament is further facilitated and made more rapid by including Forskolin or other source of cellular energy, namely induction of cAMP or cGMP. Selection of specific solvents and solvent and solute modifiers and other functional ingredients and the amounts thereof are chosen such that there is a balance between the sum of the mole-moments [(molar amount of each individual ingredient) X (dipole moment of that ingredient)] of the delivery system and the sum of the molar moments of the composition in which the medicament is dissolved. Preferably, the van der Waals forces of the delivery system is also similarly matched to the van der Waals forces of the total composition, namely, delivery system plus active agent.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 7/06; A61K 7/00; A61K 7/48; A61K 35/78

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/00 (2006.01); A61K 47/10 (2006.01); A61K 8/00 (2006.01); A61K 8/31 (2006.01); A61K 8/33 (2006.01); A61K 8/34 (2006.01); A61K 8/36 (2006.01); A61K 8/37 (2006.01); A61K 8/41 (2006.01); A61K 8/46 (2006.01); A61K 8/49 (2006.01); A61K 8/60 (2006.01); A61K 8/96 (2006.01); A61K 8/97 (2006.01); A61K 8/98 (2006.01); A61K 8/99 (2006.01); A61K 36/00 (2006.01); A61K 36/232 (2006.01); A61K 36/324 (2006.01); A61K 36/53 (2006.01); A61K 36/74 (2006.01); A61K 47/12 (2006.01); A61K 47/46 (2006.01); A61L 15/44 (2006.01); A61P 17/00 (2006.01); A61Q 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/0014 (2013.01); A61K 36/232 (2013.01); A61K 36/324 (2013.01); A61K 36/53 (2013.01); A61K 36/74 (2013.01); A61K 36/752 (2013.01); A61K 47/10 (2013.01); A61K 47/12 (2013.01); Y10S 514/946 (2013.01); Y10S 514/947 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. A61K 36/232 + A61K 2300/00
  2. A61K 36/324 + A61K 2300/00
  3. A61K 36/53 + A61K 2300/00
  4. A61K 36/74 + A61K 2300/00
  5. A61K 36/752 + A61K 2300/00

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0001351 A1 20000113; AT 399565 T 20080715; AU 4972599 A 20000124; CA 2336682 A1 20000113; CA 2336682 C 20061010; DE 69939019 D1 20080814; DK 1094781 T3 20081103; EP 1094781 A1 20010502; EP 1094781 A4 20070117; EP 1094781 B1 20080702; ES 2310042 T3 20081216; JP 2002519366 A 20020702; MX PA00012844 A 20040521; PT 1094781 E 20081008; US 2003104040 A1 20030605; US 2004202709 A1 20041014; US 6444234 B1 20020903; US 6787152 B2 20040907; US 7267829 B2 20070911

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: HOLEESTRASSE 87, 4054 BASEL (CH)

2018-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20171007

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170704

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170711

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-11-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170714

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-11-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20170713

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170703

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20170703

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170705

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170707

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170711

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170706

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-09-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170711

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20170710

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170515

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-07 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-03-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BRAUNPAT BRAUN EDER AG, CH

2015-03-13 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: TRANSDERMAL DELIVERY SOLUTIONS CORPORATION, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: TRANSDERMAL TECHNOLOGIES INC., US

2014-10-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: TRANSDERMAL DELIVERY SOLUTIONS CORPORATION, US

- Document: AT 399565 T

- Effective date: 20140909

2014-10-15 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20141007

2014-07-30 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20140703 AND 20140709

2014-05-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: TRANSDERMAL DELIVERY SOLUTIONS CORP, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: TRANSDERMAL TECHNOLOGIES INC., NORTH BALM BEACH, US

- Document: DE 69939019

- Effective date: 20140408

2014-05-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: TRANSDERMAL DELIVERY SOLUTIONS CORP, PALM BEAC, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: TRANSDERMAL TECHNOLOGIES INC., NORTH BALM BEACH, FLA., US

- Document: DE 69939019

- Effective date: 20140408

2014-05-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69939019

- Representative's name: WITTE, WELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20140408

2014-04-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69939019

- Representative's name: WITTE, WELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MBB, DE

2014-03-28 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: TRANSDERMAL DELIVERY SOLUTIONS CORPORATION, US

- Effective date: 20140217

2014-03-18 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: TRANSDERMAL DELIVERY SOLUTIONS CORPORATION

- Effective date: 20140312

2014-02-20 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: TRANSDERMAL DELIVERY SOLUTIONS CORPORATION, US

- Effective date: 20140212

2011-05-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-07-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080702

2010-02-26 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2009-06-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090403

2009-02-27 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080702

2008-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2310042 T3

2008-11-28 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20080924

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-14 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20080402632

2008-11-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2008-11-03 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2008-10-21 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2008-10-08 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20080929

2008-09-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2008-08-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69939019 P 20080814

2008-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2008-07-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070314

2007-05-02 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2007-01-17 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20061215

2007-01-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 47/10 20060101AFI20061211BHEP

2007-01-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 47/12 20060101ALI20061211BHEP

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010205

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI