Global Patent Index - EP 1094812 A1

EP 1094812 A1 2001-05-02 - ANGIOGENESIS INHIBITORS

Title (en)

ANGIOGENESIS INHIBITORS

Title (de)

ANGIOGENESISINHIBITOREN

Title (fr)

INHIBITEURS DE L'ANGIOGENESE

Publication

EP 1094812 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99932289 A

Priority

  • US 9915252 W
  • US 11088598 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0001383A1] RGD mimetics which combine a nitroaryl moiety with an arylether/ alpha -aminoacid/guanidine framework exhibit activity as antagonists toward various integrins and as inhibitors of angiogenesis.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/435; C07D 487/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 295/20 (2006.01); A61K 31/198 (2006.01); A61K 31/4168 (2006.01); A61K 31/4184 (2006.01); A61K 31/495 (2006.01); A61K 31/496 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07C 235/52 (2006.01); C07C 247/04 (2006.01); C07C 271/22 (2006.01); C07C 279/08 (2006.01); C07C 279/10 (2006.01); C07C 279/12 (2006.01); C07C 279/18 (2006.01); C07C 311/19 (2006.01); C07C 323/62 (2006.01); C07D 233/48 (2006.01); C07D 235/14 (2006.01); C07D 235/30 (2006.01); C07D 295/215 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 295/215 (2013.01); C07C 235/52 (2013.01); C07C 247/04 (2013.01); C07C 271/22 (2013.01); C07C 279/08 (2013.01); C07C 311/19 (2013.01); C07D 233/48 (2013.01); C07D 235/14 (2013.01); C07D 235/30 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0001383 A1 20000113; AU 4862599 A 20000124; BR 9911885 A 20010327; CA 2336774 A1 20000113; CN 1308534 A 20010815; EP 1094812 A1 20010502; EP 1094812 A4 20030416; HU 0104509 A2 20020429; HU 0104509 A3 20020528; ID 28125 A 20010503; JP 2002519377 A 20020702; NO 20010085 A 20010305; NO 20010085 D0 20010105; PL 345574 A1 20011217; SK 242001 A3 20011008; ZA 200007405 B 20010921

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-11 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040203

2003-04-16 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030226

2003-01-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 07D 235/14 A, 7C 07C 235/52 B, 7C 07C 247/04 B, 7C 07C 271/22 B, 7C 07C 279/08 B, 7C 07C 311/19 B, 7C 07D 233/48 B, 7C 07D 235/30 B, 7C 07D 295/20 B, 7A 61K 31/435 B

2001-12-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: THE SCRIPPS RESEARCH INSTITUTE

2001-12-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MERCK PATENT GMBH

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001213

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20000107;LT PAYMENT 20000107;LV PAYMENT 20000107;MK PAYMENT 20000107;RO PAYMENT 20000107;SI PAYMENT 20000107