Global Patent Index - EP 1094908 A1

EP 1094908 A1 2001-05-02 - METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A STEEL CAMSHAFT AND CAMSHAFT PRODUCED ACCORDING TO SAID METHOD

Title (en)

METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A STEEL CAMSHAFT AND CAMSHAFT PRODUCED ACCORDING TO SAID METHOD

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER NOCKENWELLE AUS STAHL UND NACH DIESEM VERFAHREN HERGESTELLTE NOCKENWELLE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE UN ARBRE A CAMES EN ACIER, ET ARBRE A CAMES AINSI PRODUIT

Publication

EP 1094908 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99947245 A

Priority

  • DE 9902244 W
  • DE 19833594 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19833594A1] A cast steel camshaft, having an especially profiled cylindrical internal cavity and produced by a conventional lost foam casting technique, is new. An Independent claim is also included for producing the above camshaft by bottom pouring method using an upright sand mold (1) having, over its height, runners (3) extending from a sprue (2) which is parallel to the upright mold.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22C 7/02; B22C 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22C 7/02 (2006.01); B22C 9/04 (2006.01); F02F 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22C 9/046 (2013.01); B22C 7/026 (2013.01); F02F 7/00 (2013.01); F02F 2200/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0006320A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19833594 A1 20000127; BR 9912441 A 20010417; DE 19981402 D2 20010712; DE 59912583 D1 20060202; EP 1094908 A1 20010502; EP 1094908 B1 20050921; US 6478074 B1 20021112; WO 0006320 A1 20000210

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160721

2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160721

2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170201

2017-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160801

2017-04-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170331

2017-03-22 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160721

2017-02-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59912583

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150930

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150723

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150730

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150727

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-08-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060622

2006-06-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-02-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59912583 P 20060202

2005-11-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2005-10-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59912583 P 20051027

2005-09-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-09-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-04-06 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030317

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001221

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE