Global Patent Index - EP 1094909 A1

EP 1094909 A1 2001-05-02 - IRON-BASED METALLURGICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING FLOW AGENTS AND METHODS FOR USING SAME

Title (en)

IRON-BASED METALLURGICAL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING FLOW AGENTS AND METHODS FOR USING SAME

Title (de)

METALLURGISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN AUF EISENBASIS, DIE FLUSSMITTEL ENTHALTEN UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN VERWENDUNG

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS METALLURGIQUES A BASE DE FER ET CONTENANT DES AGENTS FLUIDIFIANT ET PROCEDES D'UTILISATION CORRESPONDANTS

Publication

EP 1094909 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98929953 A

Priority

SE 9800925 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9959753A1] The present invention concerns an improved metallurgical powder composition comprising a major amount of an iron based metal powder and a minor amount of a particulate inorganic oxide having an average particle size below 500 nm.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22F 1/00 (2006.01); B22F 3/02 (2006.01); C22C 33/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22F 3/02 (2013.01); B22F 1/0059 (2013.01); C22C 33/0228 (2013.01); B22F 2003/145 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9959753A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9959753 A1 19991125; AT 285306 T 20050115; AU 7945098 A 19991206; DE 69828315 D1 20050127; DE 69828315 T2 20050609; EP 1094909 A1 20010502; EP 1094909 B1 20041222; ES 2230700 T3 20050501; JP 2002515542 A 20020528; JP 3964135 B2 20070822

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120516

2013-08-20 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130820

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120531

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120515

2013-03-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69828315

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-03-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120515

2013-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120516

2013-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120531

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120515

2013-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120531

2013-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120515

2013-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 285306 T

- Effective date: 20120515

2013-01-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110527

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110520

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110520

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110512

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110525

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110607

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110513

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110524

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-12-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050923

2005-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2230700 T3

2005-04-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BUGNION S.A.

2005-04-26 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-01-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69828315 P 20050127

2004-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2004-12-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-09-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020730

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001205

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE