Global Patent Index - EP 1094917 A1

EP 1094917 A1 2001-05-02 - HOLDING DEVICE FOR A SPECTACLE GLASS

Title (en)

HOLDING DEVICE FOR A SPECTACLE GLASS

Title (de)

AUFNAHMEVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN BRILLENGLAS

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE RECEPTION D'UN VERRE A LUNETTES

Publication

EP 1094917 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00929414 A

Priority

  • DE 19920204 A
  • EP 0003669 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19920204A1] The invention relates to a holding device (10) for a spectacle glass (24), for introducing the spectacle glass into or removing it from a container and/or for placing the spectacle glass on or removing it from a spectacle glass holding shaft of a spectacle glass edge machining device. The inventive device comprises a handling device consisting of a socket (11) which is held by the handling device and which has a hollow section (12), a controlled vacuum connection (14, 16) on said hollow section (12), a spherical cap (17) that is located in the hollow part and rests closely against a ring surface of the hollow part and has an opening (18) for deepening, and a sealing area (20) on the edge of the spherical cap for placing on an optical surface of the spectacle glass (24).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 9/14; B23Q 3/10; B24B 13/005

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 9/14 (2006.01); B24B 13/005 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 13/005 (2013.01); B24B 9/146 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0066325A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19920204 A1 20001116; DE 19920204 C2 20011031; EP 1094917 A1 20010502; EP 1094917 B1 20030129; US 6419570 B1 20020716; WO 0066325 A1 20001109

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-02-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50001162

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-01-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121228

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110524

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110427

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-01-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031030

2003-09-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-30 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030129

2003-07-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20030129

2003-03-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50001162 P 20030306

2003-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-01-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030129

2003-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030129

2002-06-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020425

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010124

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI