Global Patent Index - EP 1094932 A1

EP 1094932 A1 2001-05-02 - METHOD AND MACHINE FOR MAKING A STRING OF BAGS PROVIDED WITH TRANSVERSE CLOSURE PROFILES AND RESULTING ARTICLES

Title (en)

METHOD AND MACHINE FOR MAKING A STRING OF BAGS PROVIDED WITH TRANSVERSE CLOSURE PROFILES AND RESULTING ARTICLES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BEUTELKETTEN MIT TRANSVERSALEN VERSCHLUSSPROFILEN UND AUF DIESE ART HERGESTELLTE ARTIKEL

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET MACHINE POUR LA FABRICATION D'UN CHAPELET DE SACS MUNI DE PROFILES DE FERMETURE TRANSVERSAUX ET ARTICLES AINSI OBTENU

Publication

EP 1094932 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99929457 A

Priority

  • FR 9901678 W
  • FR 9808884 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2780913A1] The invention concerns a method for making a string of bags provided with transverse closure profiles (20), comprising steps which consist in: sequentially depositing sections of a closure system (20) including two matching closure profiles (22, 24) transversely on a film (10) designed to form the walls of the bags, and fixing the support webs (21, 23) of said two matching closure profiles (22, 24) respectively on the inner surfaces of the bag two walls, while making sure that a transverse opening (12) is sequentially provided in the film enabling access between the two profiles (22, 24). The invention also concerns a machine for implementing said method and the resulting strings of bags.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B31B 19/90; B31B 19/94

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31B 19/90 (2006.01); B31B 19/94 (2006.01); B31B 23/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B31B 70/00 (2017.08); B31B 70/8131 (2017.08); B31B 70/942 (2017.08); B31B 2155/00 (2017.08); B31B 2155/003 (2017.08); B31B 2160/10 (2017.08); Y10S 493/927 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0002722A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2780913 A1 20000114; FR 2780913 B1 20001013; AP 200102029 A0 20010331; AT 234195 T 20030315; AU 4626899 A 20000201; AU 749778 B2 20020704; BR 9911967 A 20010327; CA 2337811 A1 20000120; CA 2337811 C 20070410; CN 1107587 C 20030507; CN 1308575 A 20010815; DE 69905893 D1 20030417; DE 69905893 T2 20030828; DK 1094932 T3 20030707; EP 1094932 A1 20010502; EP 1094932 B1 20030312; ES 2189437 T3 20030701; JP 2002520187 A 20020709; JP 4644369 B2 20110302; NZ 509279 A 20031031; US 6789374 B1 20040914; WO 0002722 A1 20000120

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160710

2018-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160731

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170817

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170726

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170822

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160709

2017-07-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160709

2017-07-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-03 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2017-04-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160710

2017-03-07 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2017-02-20 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20170131

2016-11-29 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 69905893

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: B31B0001900000

- IPC: B31B0050810000

2016-07-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150730

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150729

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20150731

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20150729

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150826

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130709

2014-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-02-12 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140201

2013-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120726

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20120731

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-03-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031215

2004-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FLEXICO-FRANCE

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-09 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-07-07 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2189437 T3

2003-06-16 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030616

2003-04-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69905893 P 20030417

2003-04-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2003-04-15 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-04-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-03-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2003-03-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-03-12 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-03-12 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030312

2002-07-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-05-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 31B 1/90 A, 7B 31B 1/94 B

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010205

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE