Global Patent Index - EP 1094946 A1

EP 1094946 A1 2001-05-02 - ENGRAVING MEMBER

Title (en)

ENGRAVING MEMBER

Title (de)

GRAVIERORGAN

Title (fr)

ORGANE DE GRAVURE

Publication

EP 1094946 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99938161 A

Priority

  • DE 9901700 W
  • DE 19830471 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19830471A1] The invention relates to an engraving member pertaining to an electronic engraving machine used to engrave printing forms. The engraving member consists of a shaft (6) that oscillates around the longitudinal axis at low angles of rotation, a drive system (1,7) for said shaft (6), a lever (14) mounted on one end of the shaft (6) and provided with a burin (15) in order to engrave a printing form, a reset element (11) for the shaft (6), a bearing (98) for the shaft (6) and a damping device (8) for the shaft, consisting of a damping element secured to the shaft (6) and a fixed damping chamber. The damping element has at least one damping disk that is at least circular in certain areas and extends perpendicular to the shaft (6). The damping chamber is formed by at least one hollow cylindrical segment around the shaft (6). The damping disk protrudes into said hollow cylindrical segment and the damping chamber extends at least partially over the circular area of the damping disk. The damping chamber is filled with a ferrofluid that acts as a damping agent.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41C 1/04; H02K 37/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41C 1/045 (2006.01); H02K 37/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41C 1/045 (2013.01); Y10T 409/304312 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0002728A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19830471 A1 20000113; CN 1308578 A 20010815; EP 1094946 A1 20010502; EP 1094946 B1 20020918; JP 2002520192 A 20020709; JP 3404485 B2 20030506; US 6940621 B1 20050906; WO 0002728 A1 20000120

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180630

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150630

2016-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150630

2016-01-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140708

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2007-04-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: HELL GRAVURE SYSTEMS GMBH & CO. KG

- Free text: HELL GRAVURE SYSTEMS GMBH#PHILIPP-REIS-WEG 5#24148 KIEL (DE) -TRANSFER TO- HELL GRAVURE SYSTEMS GMBH & CO. KG#PHILIPP-REIS-WEG 5#24148 KIEL (DE)

2003-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCHINEN A.G.

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-06-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-03-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030328

2003-03-19 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020918

2003-03-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2003-03-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-12-02 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: HELL GRAVURE SYSTEMS GMBH

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902774 20021024

2002-10-09 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: HELL GRAVURE SYSTEMS GMBH

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-18 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010517

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010208

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL