Global Patent Index - EP 1094948 A2

EP 1094948 A2 2001-05-02 - SHORT INKING MECHANISM FOR ROTARY PRESSES

Title (en)

SHORT INKING MECHANISM FOR ROTARY PRESSES

Title (de)

KURZFARBWERK FÜR ROTATIONS-DRUCKMASCHINEN

Title (fr)

MECANISME D'ENCREUR COURT POUR MACHINES D'IMPRIMERIE ROTATIVES

Publication

EP 1094948 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99960674 A

Priority

  • DE 9902134 W
  • DE 19829678 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0002729A2] The invention relates to a short inking mechanism for flatbed rotary presses, comprising a roller with a structured lateral surface (e.g. an intaglio printing roller), ink ducts, a doctoring device and a form roller with a rubber elastic envelope. The aim of the invention is to provide a short inking mechanism with a structured roller e.g. an intaglio printing roller or a hatching roller. This is achieved in the following manner: the maculation rings of the roller with the structured envelope surface can be pre-stressed with the maculation ring of the form roller associated therewith, whereby said rings roll onto each other during operation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/21 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/21 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0002729A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0002729 A2 20000120; WO 0002729 A3 20000504; EP 1094948 A2 20010502; EP 1094948 B1 20020320

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160702

2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160702

2017-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160801

2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170201

2017-04-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170331

2017-03-22 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160702

2017-02-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59901022

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150731

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150727

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150925

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150723

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-25 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KOENIG & BAUER AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KOENIG & BAUER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 97080 WUERZBURG, DE

- Document: DE 59901022

2015-07-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2003-03-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021223

2003-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *KOENIG & BAUER A.G.

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-10-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2002-09-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-09-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-08-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-04-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901022 20020425

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2002-03-20 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020320

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010608

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000308

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE