Global Patent Index - EP 1094950 A1

EP 1094950 A1 2001-05-02 - PIXEL INTENSITY CONTROL IN ELECTRO-OPTIC MODULATORS

Title (en)

PIXEL INTENSITY CONTROL IN ELECTRO-OPTIC MODULATORS

Title (de)

INTENSITÄTSSTEUERUNG VON BILDELEMENTEN IN ELEKTROOPTISCHEN MODULATOREN

Title (fr)

COMMANDE DE L'INTENSITE DES PIXELS DANS DES MODULATEURS ELECTRO-OPTIQUES

Publication

EP 1094950 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00917829 A

Priority

  • EP 00917829 A
  • EP 99104942 A
  • EP 99104943 A
  • EP 99112797 A
  • US 0006274 W
  • US 29082899 A
  • US 29082999 A
  • US 13603599 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0053422A1] A laser imager comprises a modulator with an array of electrodes to control picture elements individually or by groups to produce images on a recording plane. The light intensity of each picture element or group of elements is determined by electrical potential applied between sets of controlling electrodes. These levels can be manually set or automatically exercised during a balancing routine through a feed-back loop using a photodetector to monitor and detect elements producing a light intensity higher than a set value. Control means assign to these elements a "correction voltage" to lower the density of elements they control. These correction values obtained after one or repeated balancing routines are stored in a memory and are used during the imaging cycle to produce images of substantially equal intensity on the recording medium. Different electrode arrangements to control the intensity of picture elements can be applied to different kinds of modulators and for different power levels of radiated energy.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/447

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02F 1/03 (2006.01); B41C 1/055 (2006.01); B41J 2/447 (2006.01); G06K 15/12 (2006.01); H04N 1/12 (2006.01); H04N 1/401 (2006.01); G03F 7/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 1/121 (2013.01); G06K 15/1238 (2013.01); G06K 15/1271 (2013.01); H04N 1/4015 (2013.01); G03F 7/2055 (2013.01); G03F 7/2057 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0053422A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0053422 A1 20000914; AU 3874000 A 20000928; CA 2329912 A1 20000914; DE 60031628 T2 20070913; EP 1094950 A1 20010502; EP 1094950 B1 20061102; JP 2003523841 A 20030812

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151001

2015-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60031628

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140331

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061102

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070310

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070615

2007-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070310

2007-10-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070803

2007-06-15 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2006-12-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60031628 P 20061214

2006-11-22 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: KODAK POLYCHROME GRAPHICS GMBH

2006-11-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2006-11-02 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061102

2006-06-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KODAK PLYCHROME GRAPHICS GMBH

2005-06-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KODAK POLYCHROME GRAPHICS COMPANY LTD.

2005-03-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050209

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010313

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB