Global Patent Index - EP 1094963 A2

EP 1094963 A2 2001-05-02 - ELEMENT CONNECTION PLAN FOR AN ELECTRONIC SIGNAL BOX

Title (en)

ELEMENT CONNECTION PLAN FOR AN ELECTRONIC SIGNAL BOX

Title (de)

ELEMENTVERBINDUNGSPLAN FÜR EIN ELEKTRONISCHES STELLWERK

Title (fr)

PLAN DE LIAISON D'ELEMENTS POUR POSTE D'AIGUILLAGE ELECTRONIQUE

Publication

EP 1094963 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99945881 A

Priority

  • DE 9902025 W
  • DE 19832601 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19832601C1] Assorted data elements (STI-ST4) are integrated into an element connection plan at the junction points of data elements (W1-W3, FSZ1-FSZ3) for adjacent track elements (w1-w3; s1-s3) in a track plan. Said assorted data elements process track monitoring information (GFM) for the track elements of the respective adjacent data elements. They also test whether conditions for the cancellation of the individual track elements are met. If this is the case, they cause route information in the data element of the track element for which said conditions have been met to be deleted.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61L 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61L 19/06 (2006.01); B61L 21/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61L 21/06 (2013.01); B61L 19/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0002760A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19832601 C1 20000105; AT 249956 T 20031015; CN 1151942 C 20040602; CN 1316959 A 20011010; EP 1094963 A2 20010502; EP 1094963 B1 20030917; PL 193098 B1 20070131; PL 346153 A1 20020128; WO 0002760 A2 20000120; WO 0002760 A3 20000330

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080628

2009-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080628

2009-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-04-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080628

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090101

2009-04-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090228

2009-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080628

2009-01-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070629

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070626

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-11-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070906

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070607

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-08-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070822

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-05-09 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070509

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-09-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040618

2004-07-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-01-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040103

2003-10-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59907028 P 20031023

2003-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-09-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020731

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010110

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI